Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1325580 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1325580



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 582
09.09.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.09.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.06.2013 Closing of application Search / examination 2
19.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.06.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 13
08.05.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.05.2013 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
14.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.03.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.02.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
04.02.2013 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
30.01.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.06.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.12.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 7
20.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
08.09.2009 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
17.07.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.07.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.06.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.06.2009 Claims Appeal 6
17.06.2009 Claims Appeal 6
17.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.06.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
11.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.05.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
14.03.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
09.03.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
09.03.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
09.03.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 2
09.03.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 6
09.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 6
09.01.2009 Description Search / examination 2
09.01.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
08.11.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.10.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
23.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.10.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.09.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
18.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
18.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
18.09.2008 Description Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Description Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
30.05.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.05.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
16.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 9
16.05.2008 Description Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Description Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Description Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Description Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Description Search / examination 4
16.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.12.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.03.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 11
12.11.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.11.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
28.05.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.05.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Annex Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 12
10.04.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
11.03.2003 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
06.03.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
21.02.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.02.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.11.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.11.2002 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.11.2002 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
25.04.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.04.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 94
18.04.2002 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 88
20.02.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.02.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.02.2002 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.02.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.02.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.02.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.02.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.09.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.09.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 20
18.09.2001 Description International Searching Authority 47
18.09.2001 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
18.09.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 20