Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315746

EP1315746 - CODON OPTIMISED RECOMBINANT DERMAPHAGOIDES ALLERGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / BOLLEN, Alex Université Libre des Bruxelles
Rue des Professeurs Jaener et Brachet 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
02 / JACOBS, Paul Université Libre de Bruxelles
Faculté des Sciences Avenue F. Roosevelt
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
03 / JACQUET, Alain Inst. de Biol.et de Méd. Molécul.
Rue des Professeurs Jaener et Brachet 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
04 / MASSAER, Marc G. F. Université Libre de Bruxelles
Faculté des Sciences Avenue F. Roosevelt
1050 Bruxelles / BE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date01962721.507.06.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP06483
Priority number, dateGB2000001428810.06.2000         Original published format: GB 0014288
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0196385
Date:20.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315746
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/435, A61K39/35, C12N15/85
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:CODON-OPTIMIERTE REKOMBINANTE ALLERGENE VON DERMAPHAGOIDES[2003/23]
English:CODON OPTIMISED RECOMBINANT DERMAPHAGOIDES ALLERGENS[2003/23]
French:ALLERGENE RECOMBINANT DE DERMAPHAGOIDES A CODON OPTIMISE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2002National basic fee paid 
09.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/23]
29.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.12.2007
18.12.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/28]
14.02.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/28]
Divisional application(s)EP07122676.5  / EP1927598
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9925823  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9731115  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - ANDRE S ET AL, "INCREASED IMMUNE RESPONSE ELICITED BY DNA VACCINATION WITH A SYNTHETIC GP120 SEQUENCE WITH OPTIMIZED CODON USAGE", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19980201), vol. 72, no. 2, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1497 - 1503, XP002073767 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - T-T YANG ET AL, "Optimized codon usage and chromophore mutations provide enhanced sensitivity with the green fluorescent protein", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1996), vol. 24, no. 22, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4592 - 4593, XP002120084 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.22.4592
 [Y]  - KIM C H ET AL, "Codon optimization for high-level expression of human erythropoietin (EPO) in mammalian cells", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19971015), vol. 199, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 293 - 301, XP004126394 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00384-3
 [Y]  - KAWAMOTO S ET AL, "Cloning and expression of Der f 6, a serine protease allergen from the house dust mite, Dermatophagoides farinae", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR BASIS OF DISEASE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990707), vol. 1454, no. 2, ISSN 0925-4439, pages 201 - 207, XP004276881 [Y] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4439(99)00041-1