Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1295262

EP1295262 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/13]METHOD FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS
[2011/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2017Change - applicantpublished on 17.01.2018  [2018/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[2018/03]
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / REINISCH, Helmut, Karl
Klingerstrasse 30
81369 München / DE
02 / WEILACHER, Karl, Hermann
Dahlienweg 3
85241 Hebertshausen / DE
03 / LÖFFLER, Lukas
Tannenstrasse 17a
82041 Deisenhofen / DE
 [2003/13]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/47]
Application number, filing date01962728.011.06.2001
[2003/13]
WO2001EP06579
Priority number, dateDE200012905113.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10029051
[2003/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0197180
Date:20.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1295262
Date:26.03.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001
[2003/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1295262
Date:21.11.2012
Language:DE
[2012/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/00
[2003/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/13]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ECHTHEITSPRÜFUNG VON DOKUMENTEN[2011/45]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS[2011/45]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA VERIFICATION D'AUTHENTICITE DE DOCUMENTS[2011/45]
Former [2003/13]VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTHEITSPRÜFUNG VON DOKUMENTEN
Former [2003/13]METHOD FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS
Former [2003/13]PROCEDE POUR LA VERIFICATION D'AUTHENTICITE DE DOCUMENTS
Entry into regional phase13.01.2003National basic fee paid 
13.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
23.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2012Fee for grant paid
16.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP10011637.5  / EP2278559
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.08.2013  21.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10958 Berlin / DE
Opponents representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/45]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2013   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10958 Berlin / DE
Opponents representative
Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
22.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44]
28.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.11.2013Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45]
06.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition06.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1369/16
20.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.11.2012
DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
TR21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
AT11.06.2013
IE11.06.2013
LU11.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY21.11.2012
DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
TR21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
AT11.06.2013
IE11.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2015/30]CY21.11.2012
DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
AT11.06.2013
IE11.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2014/51]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
AT11.06.2013
IE11.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2014/24]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
IE11.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2014/20]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
IE11.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2014/18]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
MC21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
Former [2013/37]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
NL21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
Former [2013/34]DK21.11.2012
FI21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
Former [2013/28]FI21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
PT21.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
GR22.02.2013
ES04.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI21.11.2012
SE21.11.2012
ES04.03.2013
Former [2013/21]SE21.11.2012
Cited inInternational search[XAY]DE19618541  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT) [X] 1,2,5-10,18,20 * column 6, line 46 - line 56; figure 6 * [A] 12,19 [Y] 3,4,13;
 [YA]EP0805408  (CUMMINS-ALLISON) [Y] 3,4 * page 52, line 30 - line 48; figure 55 * [A] 1,2,11;
 [Y]EP0845763  (NCR INTERNATIONAL) [Y] 13 * column 3, line 5 - line 22; figure . *;
 [A]EP0101115  (NEDERLANDSE CENTRALE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-WETENSCHAPPELIJK) [A] 2 * page 11, line 34 - line 39 *;
 [A]DE2723078  (FUJI ELECTRIC) [A] 2 * page 7, line 2 - page 8, line 5; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0881603  (SANYO ELECTRIC) [A] 2 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 9; figure 3 *
ExaminationEP0332161