Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1295262


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.12.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.12.2017 Change - applicant published on  17.01.2018  [2018/03]
20.07.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
11.06.2016 Change: Appeal number
11.06.2016 New entry: Appeal number
11.06.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
05.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
05.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.10.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
02.10.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
02.10.2015 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
09.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
28.03.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
13.03.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
28.10.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
04.10.2013 Opposition filed published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
04.10.2013 Change - no opposition filed published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
07.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
10.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
03.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
26.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
19.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
19.10.2012 (Expected) grant published on  21.11.2012  [2012/47]
06.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.04.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.02.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.02.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.10.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.10.2011 Change - German title published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
07.10.2011 Change - English title published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
07.10.2011 Change - French title published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
05.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  17.11.2010  [2010/46]
03.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.11.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.11.2007 First examination report
22.11.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
14.08.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
10.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.02.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.03.2003  [2003/13]
07.02.2003 Request for examination filed published on  26.03.2003  [2003/13]
29.01.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2001 PCT data prior to European publication