Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1295262

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 11.06.2013
 BELapse: 30.06.2013
 CH 
CYLapse: 21.11.2012
 DE 
 DKLapse: 21.11.2012
 ESLapse: 04.03.2013
 FILapse: 21.11.2012
 FRLapse: 01.07.2013
 GB 
 GRLapse: 22.02.2013
 IELapse: 11.06.2013
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 11.06.2013
 MCLapse: 21.11.2012
 NLLapse: 21.11.2012
 PTLapse: 21.03.2013
 SELapse: 21.11.2012
 TRLapse: 21.11.2012
Examination procedure08.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
Entry into regional phase13.01.2003National basic fee paid 
13.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
European patent granted21.11.2012
Opposition procedure06.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition06.06.2016APPEAL FILED
20.07.2016APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.03.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030113
 
Event date:26.03.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:26.03.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:26.03.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20071123
 
Event date:09.11.2011 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS
 
Event date:21.11.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:21.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:21.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 50116204 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE
 
Event date:30.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 585423 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20121215
 
Event date:19.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:17.01.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 50116204 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20130117
 
Event date:10.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130304
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130321
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130222
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:30.10.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20130822
 
Event date:06.11.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED (DELETED)
 
Event date:06.11.2013 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH
Effective DATE:20130819
 
Event date:19.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 50116204 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20130822
 
Event date:24.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 50116204 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20130819
 
Event date:31.12.2013 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
OWNER NAME:GIESECKE & DEVRIENT G.M.B.H.
Effective DATE:20130630
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:28.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20140228
 
Event date:31.03.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130630
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130611
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130701
 
Event date:15.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 585423 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20130611
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130611
 
Event date:30.06.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:30.06.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121121
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130611
 
Event date:10.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 50116204 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH, 81677 MUENCHEN, DE
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
OWNER NAME:GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: GIESECKE AND DEVRIENT GMBH, DE
 
Event date:15.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PK
Code Expl.: CORRECTION
Free Format Text:DER EINTRAG 'KEIN EINSPRUCH' ERFOLGTE IRRTUEMLICH
 
Event date:17.01.2018 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECHNOLOGY GMBH
 
Event date:14.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180118 AND 20180124
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190619
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:30.09.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20190624
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190630
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190624
Year of Fee Payment:19