Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320951

EP1320951 - AN FEC SCHEME FOR ENCODING TWO BIT-STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2012
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GADDAM, Vasanth, R.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / BRYAN, David, A.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / KELLIHER, Patrick
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Verweij, Petronella Danielle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2003/26]Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date01962888.231.07.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001EP08811
Priority number, dateUS2000063813314.08.2000         Original published format: US 638133
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0215446
Date:21.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320951
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/00, H04N5/00, H03M13/23
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EIN FEHLERKODIERSYSTEM ZUR KODIERUNG VON ZWEI BITSTRÖMEN[2003/26]
English:AN FEC SCHEME FOR ENCODING TWO BIT-STREAMS[2003/26]
French:SCHEMA DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR SANS CIRCUIT DE RETOUR DESTINE A CODER DEUX TRAINS DE BITS[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2003National basic fee paid 
14.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
17.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/47]
06.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201212   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]  - ATSC, "Annex D: RF/Transmission Characteristics", ATSC DIGITAL TELEVISION STANDARD, (19950916), pages 46 - 60, XP002187665 [A] 1,11,15 * page 41, line 1 - page 60, line L; figures 1,7.8,14,15 *
 [A]  - FRENGER P ET AL, "Rate matching in multichannel systems using RCPC-codes", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997, IEEE 47TH PHOENIX, AZ, USA 4-7 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970504), ISBN 0-7803-3659-3, pages 354 - 357, XP010228810 [A] 1,11,15 * page 354, column 1, line 19 - line 29 * * page 354, column 2, line 30 - line 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.596379
 [A]  - TEN BRINK S, "Rate one-half code for approaching the Shannon limit by 0.1 dB", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20000720), vol. 36, no. 15, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1293 - 1294, XP006015502 [A] 1,11,15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20000953