Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316094

EP1316094 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-HEATING THE CONDUCTOR ELEMENTS OF CABLES WITH EXTRUDED INSULATOR, IN PARTICULAR CONDUCTORS WITH METAL TAPE REINFORCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/23]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-HEATING THE CONDUCTOR ELEMENTS OF CABLES OF CABLES WITH EXTRUDED INSULATOR, IN PARTICULAR CONDUCTORS WITH METAL TAPE REINFORCEMENT
[2006/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prysmian Cavi e Sistemi Energia S.r.l.
Viale Sarca 222
20126 Milano / IT
[2006/10]
Former [2003/50]For all designated states
Pirelli & C. S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri 10
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
PIRELLI S.p.A.
Viale Sarca, 222
20126 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / VEGGETTI, Paolo
Via Grigna, 10
I-20052 Monza / IT
02 / DELL'ANNA, Gaia
Via Francesco Ferruccio, 22
I-20145 Milano / IT
03 / POZZATI, Giovanni
Via Feltre 9
21057 Olgiate Olona ( Varese ) / IT
04 / DEL BRENNA, Marcello
Piazzale Brescia 12
1 20149 Milano, Italy / IT
05 / SALA, Angelo
Via O. Bonfanti 18
I-23807 Merate / IT
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Riccardi, Elisa , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia, 20
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Riccardi, Elisa , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01962903.902.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP08951
Priority number, dateEP2000020285314.08.2000         Original published format: EP 00202853
US20000225309P15.08.2000         Original published format: US 225309 P
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0215205
Date:21.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316094
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316094
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01B13/14, B29C47/02
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORWÄRMUNG VON KABELLEITERELEMENTEN MIT EXTRUDIERTER ISOLIERUNG ,BESONDERS LEITER MIT METALLBANDVERSTÄRKUNG[2003/23]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-HEATING THE CONDUCTOR ELEMENTS OF CABLES WITH EXTRUDED INSULATOR, IN PARTICULAR CONDUCTORS WITH METAL TAPE REINFORCEMENT[2006/04]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PRECHAUFFER LES ELEMENTS CONDUCTEURS DE CABLES AVEC UN ISOLANT EXTRUDE, EN PARTICULIER DE CONDUCTEURS COMPORTANT UN RENFORCEMENT PAR BANDE METALLIQUE[2006/04]
Former [2003/23]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-HEATING THE CONDUCTOR ELEMENTS OF CABLES OF CABLES WITH EXTRUDED INSULATOR, IN PARTICULAR CONDUCTORS WITH METAL TAPE REINFORCEMENT
Former [2003/23]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PRECHAUFFER LES ELEMENTS CONDUCTEURS DE CABLES AVEC UN ISOLANT EXTRUDE, EN PARTICULIERS DE CONDUCTEURS COMPORTANT UN RENFORCEMENT PAR BANDE METALLIQUE
Entry into regional phase12.02.2003National basic fee paid 
12.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
09.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2006Fee for grant paid
31.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE TR
Date:12.05.2006
[2006/35]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
CY31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
TR31.05.2006
IE02.08.2006
LU02.08.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
TR31.05.2006
IE02.08.2006
LU02.08.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2008/20]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
IE02.08.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/45]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
IE02.08.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/42]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
IE02.08.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/37]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/19]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/13]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/12]AT31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/10]AT31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
Former [2007/03]AT31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
Former [2006/52]AT31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
Former [2006/48]SE31.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3022129  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *