Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315496

EP1315496 - THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arakis Ltd.
Chesterford Research Park, Little Chesterford Saffron Walden
Essex CB10 1XL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
Arakis Ltd.
Chesterford Research Park, Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden, Essex CB10 1KL / GB
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
Arakis Ltd.
Chesterford Research Park, Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Arakis Ltd.
Babraham Hall
Babraham Cambridge CB2 4AT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SKEAD, Benjamin Mark, Celltech R & D Ltd.
Granta Park, Great Abington
Cambridge CB1 6GS / GB
02 / BANNISTER, Robin Mark, Arakis Ltd.
Babraham Hall, Babraham
Cambridge CB2 4AT / GB
03 / ROTHAUL, Alan, Arakis Ltd. Chesterford Res. Park
Little Chesterford Saffron Walden
Essex CB2 1XL / GB
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Perry, Robert Edward
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date01963202.531.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001GB03924
Priority number, dateGB2000002177605.09.2000         Original published format: GB 0021776
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0219994
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315496
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315496
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/49, A61P19/00, A61P17/06, A61P1/00, A61P11/08, A61P11/06
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2003/23]
English:THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS[2003/23]
French:TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2003National basic fee paid 
20.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
08.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2005Fee for grant paid
16.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipTR17.08.2005
[2009/42]
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO0066107  (APT PHARMACEUTICALS L L C [US]) [XP] 1-6 * abstract * * page 21, lines 15-18 * * page 44, lines 3-27; examples 1-3; claims 1,29,32-39 *;
 [X]WO9000055  (DAVIS MICHAEL H [US]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 4 *;
 [X]  - BATES, EDNA J. ET AL, "Stimulation of human neutrophil degranulation by mefloquine", INT. ARCH. ALLERGY APPL. IMMUNOL. (1988), 86(4), 446-52, XP000979855 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 446, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 450, column 2, paragraphs 4,5 *
 [X]  - RAINSFORD K D, "EFFECTS OF ANTIMALARIAL DRUGS ON INTERLEUKIN 1-INDUCED CARTILAGE PROTEOGLYCAN DEGRADATION IN-VITRO", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY,GB,LONDON, (1986), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0022-3573, pages 829 - 833, XP000889827 [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 829, column 1, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  - FONTAGNE, J. ET AL, "Effects of some antimalarial drugs on rat inflammatory polymorphonuclear leukocyte function", BIOMED. PHARMACOTHER. (1989), 43(1), 43-51, XP000981559 [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 44, column 1, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 50, column 2, paragraphs 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0753-3322(89)90190-X
 [X]  - DEAN GOLDRING J P ET AL, "Antimalarial drugs modulate the expression of monocyte receptors.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0192-0561, pages 599 - 607, XP000979856 [X] 1,4 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0192-0561(99)00039-9