Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318201

EP1318201 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PURIFIED ANTHOCYANIN AND CRYSTALLINE ANTHOCYANIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd.
4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd.
4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUMOTO, H., c/o Biosc. Labs., Meiji Seika K.Ltd
3-1, Chiyoda 5-chome, Sakado-shi
Saitama 350-0289 / JP
02 / HANAMURA, S., c/o Biosc. Labs., Meiji Seika k.Ltd.
3-1, Chiyoda 5-chome, Sakado-shi
Saitama 350-0289 / JP
03 / HIRAYAMA, M., c/o Biosc Labs., Meiji Seika K, Ltd.
3-1, Chiyoda 5-chome, Sakado-shi
Saitama 350-0289 / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Former [2003/24]Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date01963597.811.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001JP07891
Priority number, dateJP2000027654012.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000276540
[2003/24]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222847
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318201
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318201
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07H17/065, C09B61/00, C12P19/14
[2004/20]
Former International [2003/24]C12P19/14, C09B61/00, C07H17/065
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUFGEREINIGTEM ANTHOCYANIN UND KRISTALLINES ANTHOCYANIN[2003/24]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PURIFIED ANTHOCYANIN AND CRYSTALLINE ANTHOCYANIN[2003/24]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ANTHOCYANINE PURIFIEE ET D'ANTHOCYANINE CRISTALLINE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2003Translation filed 
19.03.2003National basic fee paid 
19.03.2003Search fee paid 
19.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
19.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
12.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2005Fee for grant paid
10.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
CY09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
TR09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/37]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
TR09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/48]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT09.11.2005
BE09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/23]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1208755  (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP]) [E] 1-19 * examples 1,2 *;
 [DA]WO0101798  (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al);
 [A]WO9838316  (GIST BROCADES BV [NL], et al) [A] 4-7,12-14 * example 2; table 5 *
International search[X]JPH03209321  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [X]JPH03209320  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [XP]  - MATSUMOTO H. ET AL., "Preparative-scale isolation of four anthocyanin components of black current (Ribes nigrum L.) fruits", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (200103), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 1541 - 1545, XP002906737

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf001245y
 [X]  - FROYTLOG C. ET AL., "Combination of chromatographic techniques for the preparative isolation of anthocyanins-applied on blackcurrent(Ribes nigrum)", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1998), vol. 825, pages 89 - 95, XP004141945

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(98)00673-6
 [X]  - DEGENHARDT A. ET AL., "Separation and purification of anthocyanins by high-speed countercurrent chromatography and screening for antioxidant activity", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (200002), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 338 - 343, XP002906738

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf990876t
 [X]  - ANDO T. ET AL., "Floral anthocyanins in wild taxa of petunia (solanaceae)", BIOCHEMICAL SYSTEMATICS AND ECOLOGY, (1999), vol. 27, pages 623 - 650, XP002906739

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0305-1978(98)00080-5
 [X]  - ORDAZ-GALINDO A. ET AL., "Purification and identification of capulin (prunus serotina Ehrh)", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 65, pages 201 - 206, XP002906740

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0308-8146(98)00196-4
 [X]  - NORBAEK R. ET AL., "Anthocyanins in chilean species of alstroemeria", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 97 - 100, XP002906741

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(95)00859-4