Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1540848

EP1540848 - FLEXIBLE TDMA SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
Postfach 22 16 44
80506 München / DE
[2009/07]
Former [2005/24]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
Postfach 22 16 44
80506 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SUBRAMANIAN, Ravi
150 Alley Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / WOODTHORPE, Christopher, C.
24383 Loma Prieta Avenue
Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US
03 / HOLMES, David, M.
21696 Noonan Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / JHA, Uma
5054 Lago Di Grata
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
 [2006/23]
Former [2005/24]01 / SUBRAMANIAN, Ravi
150 Alley Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / WOODTHORPE, Christopher, C.
24383 Loma Prieta Avenue
Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US
03 / HOLMES, David, M.
21696 Noonan Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / JHA, Uma
534 Carnation Drive
Placentia, CA 92870 / US
Representative(s)Zinkler, Franz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Zinkler, Franz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2005/24]Zinkler, Franz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date01963807.103.08.2001
[2005/24]
WO2001US24631
Priority number, dateUS20000222827P03.08.2000         Original published format: US 222827 P
[2005/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0213418
Date:14.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1540848
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002
[2005/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1540848
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.02.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/212, H04B7/26
[2006/14]
Former International [2005/24]H04B7/212
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2005/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLE TDMA SYSTEMARCHITEKTUR[2005/24]
English:FLEXIBLE TDMA SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE[2005/24]
French:ARCHITECTURE DE SYSTEME AMRT FLEXIBLE[2005/24]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2003National basic fee paid 
07.11.2003Search fee paid 
07.11.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
10.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2003/37]
07.11.2003Examination requested  [2005/24]
07.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2008Fee for grant paid
09.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.11.2003AT   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003BE   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003CH   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003CY   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003DE   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003DK   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003ES   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003FI   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003FR   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003GB   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003GR   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003IE   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003IT   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003LU   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003MC   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003NL   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003PT   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003SE   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
07.11.2003TR   M02   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.11.2003M01   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200303   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2003
31.08.200606   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
GB03.08.2009
IE03.08.2009
LU03.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
GB03.08.2009
IE03.08.2009
LU03.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
GB03.08.2009
IE03.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2011/01]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
GB03.08.2009
IE03.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/47]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
IE03.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/35]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
IE03.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/21]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/16]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/43]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/33]ES22.05.2009
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5245611  (LING FUYUN [US], et al);
 [A]US5150384  (CAHILL STEPHEN V [US]);
 [A]US5283811  (CHENNAKESHU SANDEEP [US], et al)
Examination WO9807247
  WO9703403
  DE1973336
  WO0024149
by applicantUS5245611
 US2002031166