blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1268846

EP1268846 - Diagnosis of an autoimune disease of the thyroid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/01]DIAGNOSIS OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE
[2013/04]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.11.2013  [2013/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIAGNOSTIC HYBRIDS, INC.
One President Street
Athens, OH 45701 / US
[2003/01]
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, James, L.
26 Pleasantview Drive
Athens, OH 45701 / US
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date01964687.629.03.2001
[2003/01]
WO2001US10184
Priority number, dateUS2000053973530.03.2000         Original published format: US 539735
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0175146
Date:11.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1268846
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.10.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2003
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/02, G01N33/53, G01N33/564
[2003/01]
CPC:
G01N33/564 (EP,US); G01N2800/24 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
TitleGerman:Diagnose von Autoimmunerkrankungen der Schilddrüse[2013/04]
English:Diagnosis of an autoimune disease of the thyroid[2013/04]
French:Diagnostic d'une maladie auto-immune de la glande thyroïde[2013/04]
Former [2003/01]DIAGNOSE VON AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN
Former [2003/01]DIAGNOSIS OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE
Former [2003/01]DIAGNOSTIC DE MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES
Entry into regional phase11.10.2002National basic fee paid 
11.10.2002Search fee paid 
11.10.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
11.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.05.2008Date of oral proceedings
04.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.07.2009
10.07.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.07.2009Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/47]
02.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/47]
Appeal following examination04.11.2009Appeal received No.  T0244/10
29.12.2009Statement of grounds filed
27.07.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.08.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
19.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9916902  (UNIV WALES MEDICINE [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * claims 1-31 * [Y] 6,8-18;
 [DXY]  - EVANS C ET AL, "Development of a luminescent bioassay for thyroid stimulating antibodies.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY & METABOLISM, (199901), vol. 84, no. 1, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 374 - 377, XP002239242 [DX] 1-5,7 *the whole document; see in particular sections headed "Methods" and "Results"* [Y] 6,8-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.84.1.374
 [XY]  - WATSON P F ET AL, "A new chemiluminescent assay for the rapid detection of thyroid stimulating antibodies in Graves' disease", CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (19981101), vol. 49, ISSN 0300-0664, pages 577 - 581, XP002089745 [X] 1-5,7 *pages 579 et seq. "Assay of patient sera"* [Y] 6,8-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2265.1998.00619.x
 [Y]  - YAMASHIRO KEI ET AL, "Mechanism of the augmentative effect of high polyethylene glycol (PEG) concentrations on the thyroid stimulating activity in TSAb-IgG using a porcine thyroid cell assay.", ENDOCRINE RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0743-5800, pages 67 - 75, XP009009910 [Y] 6,8-18 *see the whole document, in particular: abstract; page 74, paragraph 3*
 [A]  - HIDAKA AKINARI ET AL, "Receptor cross-talk can optimize assays for autoantibodies to the thyrotropin receptor: Effect of phenylisopropyladenosine on adenosine 3',5'-monophosphate and inositol phosphate levels in rat FRTL-5 thyroid cells.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY & METABOLISM, (1993), vol. 77, no. 5, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 1164 - 1169, XP002239244 [A] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.77.5.1164
International search[Y]US5814461  (BERGMANN ANDREAS [DE], et al);
 [Y]  - MORGENTHALER ET AL., "Application of a bioassay with CHO cells for the routine detection of stimulating and blocking autoantibodies to the TSH-receptor", HORMONE AND METABOLISM RESEARCH, (199803), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 162 - 168, XP000944143
Examination   - INTERNET CITATION, "HyClone: Classical Media Formulation - Ham's Nutrient Mixture F-12 - Liquid Media", HYCLONE TECHNICAL DOCUMENTATION, (20090120), URL: http://www.hyclone.com/media/formulations/Hams_F12_LM.htm, (20090311), XP007907614
    - INVITROGEN CORPORATION, "Charcoal Stripped Fetal Bovine Serum", INTERNET CITATION, (20090101), URL: http://www.invitrogen.com/site/us/en/home/Products-and-Services/Applications/Cell-Culture/Mammalian-Cell-Culture/fbs/charcoal-stripped-fbs.ht, XP007907613
    - WEGNER C.C. ET AL, "Production and characterization of WEG-1, an epidermal growth factor/transforming growth factor-alpha-responsive mouse uterine epithelial cell line", ENDOCRINOLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19960101), vol. 137, no. 1, pages 175 - 184, XP009113621
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.