Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318930

EP1318930 - WIPER DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.11.2005  [2005/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / RAPP, Juergen
Hoefnerstrasse 47
77886 Lauf / DE
 [2003/25]
Application number, filing date01964912.816.08.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001DE03151
Priority number, dateDE200014557314.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10045573
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222409
Date:21.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318930
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318930
Date:24.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/24
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WISCHERANTRIEB[2003/25]
English:WIPER DRIVE[2003/25]
French:COMMANDE D'ESSUIE-GLACE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2003National basic fee paid 
14.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
08.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2004Fee for grant paid
24.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0806330  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 9 - line 22; figures 1,3-6 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 17 - line 24 * * column 8, line 49 - line 59 * * column 10, line 18 - line 26 * * column 12, line 52 - line 59 * [Y] 3;
 [YA]DE19744906  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 11 * * column 1, line 48 - line 67 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 8 - line 17 * * column 3, line 23 - line 27 * [A] 1,2;
 [A]US5287585  (YAMAMOTO TOKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 37 - line 40; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 4 - line 7 * * column 4, line 12 - line 18 * * column 4, line 34 - line 39 *;
 [A]FR2580567  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 19 - line 26; figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 5 *;
 [E]DE10011842  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [E] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - line 61 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 27 * * column 2, line 43 - line 48 * * column 3, line 9 - line 27 *
by applicantEP0781691