blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1305551

EP1305551 - ATOMIZING BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.12.2007  [2007/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Webasto Thermosysteme International GmbH
Kraillinger Strasse 5
82131 Stockdorf / DE
[2003/18]
Inventor(s)01 / WOLF, Felix
Flandernstrasse 13b
86157 Augsburg / DE
02 / MITTMANN, Bernd
Geschwister-Scholl-Ring 8
82110 Germering / DE
03 / SALLINGER, Christine
Margaretenanger 21
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
 [2003/24]
Former [2003/18]01 / WOLF, Felix
Heinrich-von-Buz-Strasse 5
86153 Augsburg / DE
02 / MITTMANN, Bernd
Geschwister-Scholl-Ring 8
82110 Germering / DE
03 / SALLINGER, Christine
Margaretenanger 21
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
Representative(s)Konnerth, Dieter Hans
Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18
81379 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Konnerth, Dieter Hans
Wiese & Konnerth Georgenstrasse 6
82152 Planegg / DE
Application number, filing date01965175.106.08.2001
[2003/18]
WO2001EP09065
Priority number, dateDE200013915206.08.2000         Original published format: DE 10039152
[2003/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0212792
Date:14.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1305551
Date:02.05.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1305551
Date:10.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:F23D11/10
[2003/18]
CPC:
F23D11/103 (EP,US); F23D11/10 (KR); F23C2900/07001 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2003/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZERSTÄUBERBRENNER[2003/18]
English:ATOMIZING BURNER[2003/18]
French:BRULEUR A PULVERISATION[2003/18]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2002National basic fee paid 
18.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2002Examination requested  [2003/18]
14.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2006Fee for grant paid
29.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3972182  (SALVI ENRICO) [X] 1,2,11,12 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 16 - line 19 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 18 - line 28 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 7 * [Y] 3-8;
 [X]US4842197  (SIMON BURKHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 11 - line 26 * * column 4, line 3 - line 26 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]DE19738054  (KOEHNE HEINRICH DR ING [DE]) [Y] 3-8 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 52 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9828493  (KU EI HOE [KR]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * figures 5,6 * * page 15, line 8 - line 20 *;
 [PX]EP1058052  (GEN ENTREPRISE [FR]) [PX] 1,2 * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 6, line 10 - line 39 * * column 7, line 40 - line 47 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [E]WO0171251  (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,4,11,12 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 ** figures 1,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.