Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318939

EP1318939 - HOOD ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KEEN, Eric, Albert
612 Lorraine Avenue
Waterloo, IA 50702 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Lau-Loskill, Philipp
Deere & Company
European Office
Steubenstrasse 34-62
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Lau-Loskill, Philipp, Dipl.-Phys.
Deere & Company, European Office, Steubenstrasse 34-62
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date01965234.630.08.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001EP09991
Priority number, dateUS2000066185614.09.2000         Original published format: US 661856
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0222430
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318939
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318939
Date:04.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/10, B60K13/02
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:MOTORHAUBE[2003/25]
English:HOOD ASSEMBLY[2003/25]
French:ASSEMBLAGE DE CAPOT[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2003National basic fee paid 
02.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2005Fee for grant paid
25.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.12.2099Examination requested  [2003/33]
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
TR04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
CY30.08.2005
IE30.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
[2009/42]
Former [2007/20]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
CY30.08.2005
IE30.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2007/10]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
IE30.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/40]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
IE30.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/28]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/22]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
NL04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
CH04.05.2005
LI04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
GR04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
PT17.10.2005
Former [2006/13]AT04.05.2005
BE04.05.2005
DK04.08.2005
SE04.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE04.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US5564514  (KNIGHT DAVID L [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 36 - line 51; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5782312  (MURAKAWA MASATAKE [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 44; figures 10-12 *