blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1305808

EP1305808 - INTEGRATED INDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2003/18]
Inventor(s)01 / LEMAIRE, Frédéric
14, rue de l'Europe
F-38120 Saint Egreve / FR
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date01965316.103.08.2001
[2003/18]
WO2001FR02546
Priority number, dateFR2000001034004.08.2000         Original published format: FR 0010340
[2003/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0213212
Date:14.02.2002
Language:FR
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1305808
Date:02.05.2003
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01F17/00, H01L23/64
[2003/18]
CPC:
H01L23/5227 (EP,US); H01F17/0006 (EP,US); H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2003/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE INDUKTIVITÄT[2003/18]
English:INTEGRATED INDUCTOR[2003/18]
French:INDUCTANCE INTEGREE[2003/18]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2003National basic fee paid 
25.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
01.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/35]
08.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200707   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH08116031  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08116031 A 19960507 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - BURGHARTZ J N ET AL, "MONOLITHIC SPIRAL FABRICATED USING A VLSI CU-DAMASCENE INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGY AND LOW-LOSS SUBSTRATES", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING (IEDM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19961208), ISBN 0-7803-3394-2, pages 99 - 102, XP000753739 [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.