Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319115

EP1319115 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A LATERAL WELLBORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]For all designated states
WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600
Houston Texas 77027 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAUGEN, David, Michael
408 N Iowa Ave
League City, TX 77573 / US
02 / TILTON, Frederick, Thomas
3414 Rolling Terrace
Spring, TX 77388 / US
03 / GRAY, Kevin, Leon
16102 Forest Bend
Friendswood, TX 77549 / US
04 / BRUNNERT, David
7915 Clarion Way
Houston, TX 77040 / US
05 / BADRAK, Robert
902 Sugarfield Ct.
Sugarland, TX 77478 / US
06 / SIMPSON, Neil, Alexander, Abercrombie
Burn of Daff Farm, Downies
Aberdeen, Grampian AB12 4BX / GB
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date01965418.510.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001GB04045
Priority number, dateUS2000065885811.09.2000         Original published format: US 658858
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0223008
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319115
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319115
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:E21B29/02, E21B29/06, E21B7/08, E21B17/07, E21B27/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LATERALBOHRUNG[2003/25]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A LATERAL WELLBORE[2003/25]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DESTINES A FORMER UN PUITS DE FORAGE LATERAL[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2003National basic fee paid 
20.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
01.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2006Fee for grant paid
24.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
DE09.02.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]NL08.11.2006
DE09.02.2007
FR22.06.2007
Former [2007/48]NL08.11.2006
DE09.02.2007
Former [2007/28]NL08.11.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2346633  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,29 * page 2, line 12 - line 18; figures 11-14; claims 1,2,7,11 *;
 [XA]US5791417  (HAUGEN DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,10,29 * column 2, line 26 - line 42; figures 6,7 * * column 3, line 8 - line 63 * [A] 12,28;
 [A]WO9964715  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 14 - line 24; figure 3; claim 9 *;
 [A]US5135050  (TAILBY ROGER [NO]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,6,7 *;
 [A]US6016753  (GLENN JOSEPH G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 16 - line 33; figure 4 *;
 [PA]WO0066876  (ROBERTSON MICHAEL C [US]) [PA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0846838  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [Y] 12-17,21,28 * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 47; figures 10,11 * * column 14, line 49 - line 52 *;
 [Y]US2506799  (LIVINGSTON HERMAN G) [Y] 12-17,21,28 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 7; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4905759  (WESSON DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 12,28 * column 1, line 49 - line 59; figure 1 *;
 [XY]US5435394  (ROBERTSON MICHAEL C [US]) [X] 24,27 * column 1, line 42 - line 58; figure 3 * [Y] 25,26;
 [Y]GB2177740  (VETCO LTD C E) [Y] 25,26 * page 2, line 68 - line 114; figure 9; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO0050727  (LTI JOINT VENTURES [US]) [X] 24,27 * figure 4; claim 1 *