Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317937

EP1317937 - GASKET AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE GASKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2007  [2007/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
For all designated states
Kokoku Intech Co., Ltd
2-7, Kojimachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0083 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
For all designated states
Kokoku Intech Co., Ltd
2-7, Kojimachi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0083 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TACHIKAWA, Kouichi, c/o Terumo kabushiki kaisha
1727-1, Tsuiji-Arai, Shouwa-cho
Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 409-3853 / JP
02 / YUNOKI, Hiroyuki, c/o Terumo kabushiki kaisha
1727-1, Tsuiji-Arai, Shouwa-cho
Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 409-3853 / JP
03 / KIKUCHI, Yutaka, c/o KoKoKu Rubber Tech., Inc.
2335, Komuro, Inamachi
Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama 362-0800 / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Casalonga, Axel
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01965665.114.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001JP08014
Priority number, dateJP2000028091314.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000280913
JP2000028091414.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000280914
[2003/24]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222192
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317937
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICHTUNG UND IHRE HERSTELLUNGSMETHODE[2003/24]
English:GASKET AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE GASKET[2003/24]
French:JOINT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2003Translation filed 
14.03.2003National basic fee paid 
14.03.2003Search fee paid 
14.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
04.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/12]
31.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YAX]EP0264273  (DAIKYO GOMU SEIKO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 11; figures 4,5 * * page 3, lines 45-49 * [A] 14-16 [X] 11-13,17-23;
 JPS5747637  [ ];
 [YAX]WO9413345  (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 3; figure 2 * [A] 14-16 [X] 11-13,17-23;
 [YAX]EP0338671  (DAIKYO GOMU SEIKO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 10 * [A] 14-16 [X] 11-13,17-23;
 [YX]EP0205312  (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * [X] 11-23;
 [X]EP0450098  (NISSHO KK [JP]) [X] 11-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9938672  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 11-23 * the whole document *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820703), vol. 006, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 140), [ ] * abstract *
International search[A]EP0879611  (DAIKYO SEIKO LTD [JP]);
 [Y]JPH0666689  (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH)