Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317832

EP1317832 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TIME-SLICED AND MULTI-THREADED DATA PROCESSING IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE, LU
published on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Deutschland GmbH
Am Campeon 10-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
[2015/50]
Former [2012/11]For all designated states
Intel Mobile Communications GmbH
Am Campeon 10-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Former [2004/29]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81541 München / DE
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Morphics Technology, Inc.
1550 S. Bascom Avenue
Campbell, CA 95008-0638 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RIEKEN, Keith
21603 La Playa Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / MEDLOCK, Joel, D.
15745 Shannon Road
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
03 / HOLMES, David, M.
21696 Noonan Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/50]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2013/37]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2008/32]Zinkler, Franz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2004/10]Zinkler, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2003/24]Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date01965851.731.07.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US24442
Priority number, dateUS20000222007P31.07.2000         Original published format: US 222007 P
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0211386
Date:07.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317832
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317832
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.02.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707, G06F9/48, H04B1/7117
[2016/30]
Former International [2008/51]H04L27/30, G06F9/46, H04B1/28, H04L1/00, H04L29/06, G06F9/50
Former International [2003/24]H04L27/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ZEITSCHEIBEN- SOWIE VIELFADENDATENVERARBEITUNG IN EINEM VERMITTLUNGSSYSTEM[2003/24]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TIME-SLICED AND MULTI-THREADED DATA PROCESSING IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2003/24]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR UN TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES A TRANCHE DE TEMPS ET MULTIFILIERE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2003National basic fee paid 
28.02.2003Search fee paid 
28.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
25.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2016Fee for grant paid
07.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2010
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
21.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
14.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH31.07.2017
IE31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
LU31.07.2017
[2018/34]
Former [2018/21]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
Documents cited:Search[PXL]WO0069084  (MORPHICS TECH INC [US]) [PX] 1-13 * abstract * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 27 * * page 12, line 5 - line 10 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 5 * [PL] 1-13;
 [PA]WO0069192  (MORPHICS TECH INC [US]) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - RABAEY J M ET AL, "Heterogeneous reconfigurable systems", SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS, 1997. SIPS 97 - DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION., 1997 IEEE WORKSHOP ON LEICESTER, UK 3-5 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971103), ISBN 978-0-7803-3806-7, pages 24 - 34, XP010249763 [X] 1-13 * p.27 first paragraph last sentence;p.28 sixth paragraph;p.29 second paragraphp.30 sixth paragraphp.32 second paragraph to p. 33 third parargaph * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SIPS.1997.625684
 [X]  - ABNOUS A ET AL, "Ultra-low-power domain-specific multimedia processors", VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING, IX, 1996., WORKSHOP ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 30 OCT.-1 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961030), ISBN 978-0-7803-3134-1, pages 461 - 470, XP010199037 [X] 1-13 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VLSISP.1996.558379
 [A]  - RABAEY J M, "Reconfigurable processing: the solution to low-power programmable DSP", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-8186-7919-3, pages 275 - 278, XP010226188 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.599622
 [A]  - TUTTLEBEE W, "Software radio-impacts and implications", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 1998 IEEE 5TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUN CITY, SOUTH AFRICA 2-4 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980902), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-4281-1, pages 541 - 545, XP010307620 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSTA.1998.723843
 [A]  - ARRIGO J F ET AL, "Adaptive FEC on a reconfigurable processor for wireless multimedia communications", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1998. ISCAS '98. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE IN TERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MONTEREY, CA, USA 31 MAY-3 JUNE 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980531), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-4455-6, pages 417 - 420, XP010289453 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1998.698897
 [A]  - HALTER S ET AL, "Reconfigurable signal processor for channel coding and decoding in low SNR wireless communications", SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS, 1998. SIPS 98. 1998 IEEE WORKSHOP ON CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA 8-10 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19981008), ISBN 978-0-7803-4997-1, pages 260 - 274, XP010303741 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SIPS.1998.715789
International search[A]US6091762  (DAVIS MARK [US], et al);
 [A]US6005856  (JENSEN RYAN N [US], et al)
by applicantWO0069084
    - RABAEY J. M. ET AL., "Heterogeneous reconfigurable systems", SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS, 1997. SIPS 97 - DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION., 1997, IEEE WORKSHOP ON LEICESTER, UK 3-5 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, US, (19971103), doi:doi:10.1109/SIPS.1997.625684, pages 24 - 34, XP010249763

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SIPS.1997.625684
    - ABNOUS A ET AL., "Ultra-low-power domain-specific multimedia processors", VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING, IX, 1996., WORKSHOP ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 30 OCT. - 1 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, US, (19961030), doi:doi:10.1109/VLSISP.1996.558379, pages 461 - 470, XP010199037

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VLSISP.1996.558379