Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317711

EP1317711 - ARCHITECTURE FOR PROVIDING BLOCK-LEVEL STORAGE ACCESS OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3Ware, Inc.
455 West Maude Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2003/49]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
3Ware, Inc.
701 Middlefield Road, Suite 300
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JEWETT, Douglas, E.
2503 Resnick Drive
Round Rock, TX 78681 / US
02 / RADFORD, Adam
234 Escuela Avenue 5
Mission Viejo, CA 94040 / US
03 / STRAND, Bradley
139 Wilder Avenue
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
04 / CHUNG, Jeffrey
19608 Pruneridge Avenue, Apt 3203
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / JACOBSON, Joel
691 Victor Way 4
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
06 / HAIGLER, Robert
35614 Reymouth Drive
Newark, CA 94560 / US
07 / THOMPSON, Rod
1287 Vincent Drive 222
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
08 / COUCH, Thomas
104 Glenwood Avenue
Woodside, CA 94062-3513 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2003/28]01 / JEWETT, Douglas, E.
2503 Resnick Drive
Round Rock, TX 78681 / US
02 / RADFORD, Adam
234 Escuela Avenue #5
Mission Viejo, CA 94040 / US
03 / STRAND, Bradley
139 Wilder Avenue
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
04 / CHUNG, Jeffrey
19608 Pruneridge Avenue, Apt 3203
Cupertino, #CA 95014 / US
05 / JACOBSON, Joel
691 Victor Way #4
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
06 / HAIGLER, Robert
35614 Reymouth Drive
Newark, CA 94560 / US
07 / THOMPSON, Rod
1287 Vincent Drive #222
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
08 / COUCH, Thomas
104 Glenwood Avenue
Woodside, CA 94062-3513 / US
Former [2003/24]01 / JEWETT, Douglas, E.
2503 Resnick Drive
Round Rock, TX 78681 / US
02 / RADFORD, Adam
/ US
03 / STRAND, Bradley
/ US
04 / CHUNG, Jeffrey
/ US
05 / JACOBSON, Joel
/ US
06 / HAIGLER, Robert
/ US
07 / THOMPSON, Rod
/ US
08 / COUCH, Thomas
/ US
Representative(s)Musker, David Charles , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Musker, David Charles , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date01965893.910.08.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US25256
Priority number, dateUS20000224664P11.08.2000         Original published format: US 224664 P
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0215018
Date:21.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317711
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/00, G06F12/00, G06F3/00
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARCHITEKTUR ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON SPEICHERZUGRIFF AUF BLOCKEBENE ÜBER EIN COMPUTERNETZWERK[2003/24]
English:ARCHITECTURE FOR PROVIDING BLOCK-LEVEL STORAGE ACCESS OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK[2003/24]
French:ARCHITECTURE D'ACCES A UN STOCKAGE DE NIVEAU BLOC, SUR UN RESEAU INFORMATIQUE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2003National basic fee paid 
07.03.2003Search fee paid 
07.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
08.03.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5974532  ;
 [YP]US6137796  ;
 [Y]US5754830  ;
 [Y]US5127097  ;
 [Y]US5867491