Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320298

EP1320298 - FROZEN BEVERAGE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2008
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FBD Partnership LP
8161 Interchange Parkway Suite 115 P.O. Box 18597
San Antonio TX 78218 / US
[2007/33]
Former [2007/26]For all designated states
Lancer FBD Partnership, Ltd.
1224 North Post Oak, Ste 130
Houston, TX 77055 / US
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Lancer FBD
1224 North Post Oak, Ste 130
Houston, TX 77055 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRANK, Jimmy, I.
1124 North Post Oak, Ste 130
Houston, TX 77055 / US
02 / GUY, Thomas, L., III
5807 Business Park
san Antonio, TX 78218 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20, Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2003/26]Akers, Noel James , et al
Howrey Simon Arnold & White, City Point, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
Application number, filing date01965977.018.08.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US25766
Priority number, dateUS20000226228P18.08.2000         Original published format: US 226228 P
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0215710
Date:28.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320298
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320298
Date:27.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/26]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1320298
Date:10.10.2007
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A23G9/04, A23G9/22, A23G9/20, A23G9/28
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MASCHINE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEFRORENEN GETRÄNKEN[2003/26]
English:FROZEN BEVERAGE MACHINE[2003/26]
French:MACHINE A BOISSONS GLACEES[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2003National basic fee paid 
12.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
01.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2007Fee for grant paid
09.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
CY27.06.2007
DK27.06.2007
FI27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
TR27.06.2007
LU18.08.2007
IE20.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
CY27.06.2007
DK27.06.2007
FI27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
LU18.08.2007
IE20.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2009/33]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
CY27.06.2007
DK27.06.2007
FI27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
IE20.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2009/15]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
DK27.06.2007
FI27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
IE20.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2008/45]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
DK27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
IE20.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2008/23]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
DK27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2008/20]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
SE27.09.2007
GR28.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
CH27.06.2007
LI27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
SE27.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2008/10]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
SE27.09.2007
PT27.11.2007
Former [2008/09]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
NL27.06.2007
SE27.09.2007
Former [2008/04]AT27.06.2007
BE27.06.2007
SE27.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT27.06.2007
SE27.09.2007
Former [2007/48]SE27.09.2007
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4848381  (LIVINGSTON JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-17,20,21,23-43 * column 7, line 21 - column 8, line 40; figures 1,1A,1B; claims 1,20,22 * * column 4, line 57 - column 7, line 9; claims 1,20,22,23 * [Y] 8;
 [Y]JPH11235154  ;
 [X]US5095710  (BLACK WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,12,18-43 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 17; figures 1-8 * * column 14, line 19 - line 63 *;
 [XD]US5706661  (FRANK JIMMY I [US]) [XD] 1,23,24,36-43 * the whole document *;
 [XD]US5806550  (FRANK JIMMY I [US]) [XD] 1,23,24,36-43 * the whole document *;
 [XD]US5743097  (FRANK JIMMY I [US]) [XD] 1,23,24,36-43 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3295997  (TOMLINSON BARNARD E, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH11253107  ;
 [A]US4747272  (HOWELL RONALD D [US], et al);
 [AP]US6126983  (MILLER ERIC R [US]);
 [A]GB2181068  (CHERRY BURRELL CORP);
 [AD]US5121855  (CREDLE JR WILLIAM S [US])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, [Y] 8 * figures 1,3,4,6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, [A] 1,23,36 * abstract *
by applicantUS5706661
 US5743097
 US5799726
 US5121855
 US5806550
 US6189745