Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315732

EP1315732 - RADICICOL AND MONOCILLIN AND THEIR ANALOGUES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sloan-Kettering Institute for Cancer Research
1275 York Avenue
New York
New York 10021 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
Sloan-Kettering Institute For Cancer Research
1275 York Avenue New York
New York 10021 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Sloan-Kettering Institute For Cancer Research
1275 York Avenue
New York, New York 10021 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DANISHEFSKY, Samuel, J.
22 Brayton Street
Englewood, NJ 07631 / US
02 / GARBACCIO, Robert, M.
133 Addison Lane
Landsdale, PA 19446 / US
03 / BAESCHLIN, Daniel, K.
In der Schappe 141
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
04 / STACHEL, Shawn, J.
422 Longleaf Drive
Perkasie, PA 18944 / US
05 / SOLIT, David
450 East 63rd Street, Apartment4L
New York, NY 01121 / US
06 / ROSEN, Neil
171 Jones Road
Englewood, NJ 07631 / US
 [2003/33]
Former [2003/23]01 / DANISHEFSKY, Samuel, J.
22 Brayton Street
Englewood, NJ 07631 / US
02 / GARBACCIO, Robert, M.
133 Addison Lane
Landsdale, PA 19446 / US
03 / BAESCHLIN, Daniel, K.
In der Schappe 141
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
04 / STACHEL, Shawn, J.
422 Longleaf Drive
Perkasie, PA 18944 / US
05 / SOLIT, David
New York, NY / US
06 / ROSEN, Neal
Englewood, NJ / US
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]King, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date01966236.024.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US26577
Priority number, dateUS20000228277P25.08.2000         Original published format: US 228277 P
US20010304553P11.07.2001         Original published format: US 304553 P
US2001093875424.08.2001         Original published format: US 938754
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0216369
Date:28.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315732
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315732
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D493/04, C07D491/04, C07D313/00, C07D225/06, A61P43/00, A61K31/395, // (C07D493/04, 313:00), C07D303:00,(C07D491/04, 303:00), C07D225:00
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:RADICICOL UND MONOCILLIN UND IHRE ANALOGEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN[2003/23]
English:RADICICOL AND MONOCILLIN AND THEIR ANALOGUES AND USES THEREOF[2003/23]
French:RADICICOL ET MONOCILLIN ET LEURS ANALOGUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2003National basic fee paid 
25.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
15.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2006Fee for grant paid
07.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
CY07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
FR07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
TR07.06.2006
IE24.08.2006
LU24.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/37]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
TR07.06.2006
IE24.08.2006
LU24.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2008/20]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
IE24.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/42]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
IE24.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/37]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
MC31.08.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
DE08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
MC31.08.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/19]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
MC31.08.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/12]AT07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/51]FI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE07.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0038674  (NOVATION PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-8,12-17,21,27,30-46 * table page 24-25 entries 3 and 4; page 3, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 17, paragraph 3 * * page 21, paragraph 3 *;
 [AD]US5650430  (SUGIMURA YUKIO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-8,12-17,21,27,30-46 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0889042  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-8,12-17,21,27,30-46 * claims 1,8 *;
 [A]US4166764  (CALTON GARY J [US], et al) [A] 47-56 * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - SHIOTSU, YUKIMASA ET AL, "Novel oxime derivatives of radicicol induce erythroid differentiation associated with preferential G1 phase accumulation against chronic myelogenous leukemia cells through destabilization of Bcr-Abl with Hsp90 complex", BLOOD (2000), 96(6), 2284-2291, XP002190760 [A] 1-8,12-17,21,27,30-46 * figure 1 *
 [AD]  - LAMIPLAS M., LETT, R., "CONVERGENT STEREOSPECIFIC TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF MONOCHIRAL MONOCILLIN I RELATED MACROLIDES", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, GB, (1992), vol. 33, no. 6, pages 773 - 776, XP001061596 [AD] 47-56 * page 775 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)77712-4
 [PA]  - KI, SE WON ET AL, "Radicicol binds and inhibits mammalian ATP citrate lyase", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 50, pages 39231 - 39236, XP002190759 [PA] 1-8,12-17,21,27 * compound BR-2(-), BR-3(-), BR-4(-) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M006192200
 [PA]  - GARBACCIO R. M., DAMISHEFSKY S.J., "EFFICIENT ASYMMETRIC SYNTHESIS OF RADICICOL DIMETHYL ETHER: A NOVEL APPLICATION OF RING-FORMING OLEFIN METATHESIS", ORGANIC LETTERS, USA, (2000), vol. 2, no. 20, pages 3127 - 3129, XP002190761 [PA] 47-56 * SCHEME 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol0063252