Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315812

EP1315812 - MODIFIED POLYPEPTIDES STABILIZED IN A DESIRED CONFORMATION AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2010
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Center for Blood Research, INC.
800 Huntington Avenue
Boston, MA 02115 / US
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / SPRINGER, Timothy, A.
36 Woodman Road
Newton, MA 02167 / US
02 / SHIMOAKA, Motomu
73 Longwood Avenue
Brookline, MA 02446 / US
03 / LU, Chafen
36 Woodman Road
Newton, MA 02167 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Sundkrogsgade 9, P.O. Box 831
2100 Copenhagen O / DK
Application number, filing date01966492.931.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US27227
Priority number, dateUS20000229700P01.09.2000         Original published format: US 229700 P
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0218583
Date:07.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315812
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315812
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/705, G06F17/50, A01K67/027, A61K38/17, A61K31/7088, G01N33/53
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERÄNDERTE, IN GEWÜNSCHTER KONFORMATION STABILISIERTE POLYPEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2003/23]
English:MODIFIED POLYPEPTIDES STABILIZED IN A DESIRED CONFORMATION AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME[2003/23]
French:POLYPEPTIDES MODIFIES STABILISES DANS UNE CONFORMATION SOUHAITEE ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANTS[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2003National basic fee paid 
30.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
01.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.03.2009
02.03.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2009Fee for grant paid
05.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
NL11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
TR11.11.2009
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
NL11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2011/14]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
IT11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/47]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
GR12.02.2010
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/35]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
DK11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/31]AT11.11.2009
BE11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/30]AT11.11.2009
CY11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/25]CY11.11.2009
FI11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/22]FI11.11.2009
SE11.11.2009
ES22.02.2010
PT11.03.2010
Former [2010/19]ES22.02.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9517412  (ICOS CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [X]  - PETRUZZELLI LILLI ET AL, "Activation of lymphocyte function-associated molecule-1 (CD11a/CD18) and Mac-1 (CD11b/CD18) mimicked by an antibody directed against CD18.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 155, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 854 - 866, XP002209615 [X] 25-30 * the whole document *
 [XDY]  - HAZES B ET AL, "MODEL BUILDING OF DISULFIDE BONDS IN PROTEINS WITH KNOWN THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1988), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 119 - 126, XP001074212 [XD] 38-43 * the whole document * [Y] 1-35,44-72
 [Y]  - SHIMAOKA M ET AL, "COMPUTATIONAL DESIGN OF AN INTEGRIN I DOMAIN STABILIZED IN THE OPEN HIGH AFFINITY CONFORMATION", NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200008), vol. 8, no. 7, ISSN 1072-8368, pages 674 - 678, XP008006358 [Y] 1-7,12-28,32-35,44-55,57,58,61,62,72 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/77978
 [YD]  - QU AIDONG ET AL, "Crystal structure of the I-domain from the CD11a/CD18 (LFA-1, alpha-L-beta-2) integrin.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1995, (1995), vol. 92, no. 22, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10277 - 10281, XP002209616 [YD] 1-11,16-35,44-72 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.22.10277
 [AD]  - SALI A ET AL, "COMPARATIVE PROTEIN MODELLING BY SATISFACTION OF SPATIAL RESTRAINTS", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (1993), vol. 234, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 779 - 815, XP002948615 [AD] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1993.1626
 [AD]  - LEE J-O ET AL, "CRYSTAL STRUCTURE OF THE A DOMAIN FROM THE ALPHA SUBUNIT OF INTEGRIN CR3 (CD11B/CD18)", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (19950224), vol. 80, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 631 - 638, XP002920554 [AD] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90517-0
 [AD]  - LEE JIE-OH ET AL, "Two conformations of the integrin A-domain (I-domain): A pathway for activation?", STRUCTURE (LONDON), (1995), vol. 3, no. 12, ISSN 0969-2126, pages 1333 - 1340, XP008006249 [AD] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(01)00271-4
 [A]  - OXVIG CLAUS ET AL, "Conformational changes in tertiary structure near the ligand binding site of an integrin I domain.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, March 2, 1999, (19990302), vol. 96, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2215 - 2220, XP002209413 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.5.2215
 [A]  - LI RUI ET AL, "Two functional states of the CD11b A-domain: Correlations with key features of two Mn2+-complexed crystal structures.", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (19981214), vol. 143, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 1523 - 1534, XP002209418 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.143.6.1523
 [A]  - HUTH J R ET AL, "NMR AND MUTAGENESIS EVIDENCE FOR AND I DOMAIN ALLOSTERIC SITE THAT REGULATES LYMPHOCYTE FUNCTION-ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN 1 LIGAND BINDING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (20000509), vol. 97, no. 10, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5231 - 5236, XP000938664 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.10.5231
 [PX]  - LU CHAFEN ET AL, "An isolated, surface-expressed I domain of the integrin alphaLbeta2 is sufficient for strong adhesive function when locked in the open conformation with a disulfide bond.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, February 27, 2001, (20010227), vol. 98, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2387 - 2392, XP002209618 [PX] 1-11,16-23,25-30,32-35,38-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.041606398
 [PX]  - LU CHAFEN ET AL, "Locking in alternate conformations of the integrin alphaLbeta2 I domain with disulfide bonds reveals functional relationships among integrin domains.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, February 27, 2001, (20010227), vol. 98, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2393 - 2398, XP002209619 [PX] 1-11,16-23,25-30,32-35,38-43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.041618598
 [PX]  - SHIMAOKA MOTOMU ET AL, "Reversibly locking a protein fold in an active conformation with a disulfide bond: Integrin alphaL I domains with high affinity and antagonist activity in vivo.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, May 22, 2001, (20010522), vol. 98, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6009 - 6014, XP002209620 [PX] 1-11,16-23,25-30,32-35,38-43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.101130498
 [PX]  - ORCHEKOWSKI RANDAL P ET AL, "alphaMbeta2 (CD11b/CD18, Mac-1) integrin activation by a unique monoclonal antibody to alphaM I domain that is divalent cation-sensitive.", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (200011), vol. 68, no. 5, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 641 - 649, XP008006357 [PX] 25,26,28 * the whole document *
 [T]  - SHIMAOKA M ET AL, "CONFORMATIONAL REGULATION OF INTEGRIN STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOPHYSICS AND BIOMOLECULAR STRUCTURE, ANNUAL REVIEWS INC., PALO ALTO, CA, US, (200207), vol. 31, no. 31, ISSN 1056-8700, pages 485 - 516,C01-C08, XP008006352 [T] * page 494, paragraph 4 - page 495, paragraph 2 * * page 497, paragraph 2 - page 500, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.biophys.31.101101.140922
by applicantWO9108298
 US5223409
 WO9117271
 US4873316
 WO9011354
 WO9215679
 WO9200968
 WO9201047
 US4522811
 WO9002809
 US4676980
 EP0184187
 EP0171496
 EP0173494
 WO8601533
 US4816567
 EP0125023
 US5225539
 US5888765
 EP0264166
 US4736866
 US4870009
 US4873191
 WO9101140
 WO9304169
 US5328470
    - HUANG, C ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 21514 - 24,
    - SPRINGER, TA, NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 425 - 433,
    - ROBINSON, MK ET AL., JIMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 148, pages 1080 - 1085,
    - VAN DER VIEREN, M ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, pages 683 - 690,
    - SPRINGER, TA, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 65 - 72,
    - DU, X ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1993), vol. 268, pages 23087 - 23092,
    - TAKADA, Y ET AL., EMBO J, (1989), vol. 8, pages 1361 - 1368,
    - WEISEL, JW ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1992), vol. 267, pages 16637 - 16643,
    - SHAW, S K ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, pages 6016 - 6025,
    - MARLIN, SD ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 51, pages 813 - 819,
    - LEE, J-O ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1995), vol. 3, pages 1333 - 1340,
    - DE FOUGEROLLES ET AL., JEXP MED, (1991), vol. 1, no. 74, pages 253 - 267,
    - QU, A; LEAHY, DJ, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 10277 - 10281,
    - EDWARDS, CP ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, pages 28937 - 28944,
    - EMSLEY, J ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 28512 - 28517,
    - CHAMPE, M ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 1388 - 1394,
    - KALLEN, J ET AL., JMOL BIOL, (1999), vol. 292, pages 1 - 9,
    - YALAMANCHILI, P ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 21877 - 82,
    - PUZON-MCLAUGHLIN, W; TAKADA, Y, JBIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, pages 20438 - 20443,
    - MICHISHITA, MET, CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 857 - 867,
    - ZHOU, L ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, pages 17075 - 17079,
    - ROBINSON, MK ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 148, pages 1080 - 1085,
    - KAMATA, T ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, pages 9659 - 9663,
    - SHIH, DT ET AL., JCELL BIOL, (1993), vol. 122, pages 1361 - 1371,
    - DIAMOND, MS ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 506 - 517,
    - NERMUT, MV ET AL., EMBO J, (1988), vol. 7, pages 4093 - 4099,
    - DRANSFIELD, I ET AL., J CELL BIOL, (1992), vol. 116, pages 219 - 226,
    - WIPPLER, J ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, pages 8754 - 8761,
    - KEIZER, GD ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1988), vol. 140, pages 1393 - 1400,
    - STAUNTON, DE ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 339, pages 61 - 64,
    - ANDREW, D ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 23, pages 2217 - 2222,
    - HUANG, C ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 19008 - 19016,
    - DIAMOND, MS ET AL., J CELL BIOL, (1993), vol. 120, pages 545 - 556,
    - RANDI, AM ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1994), vol. 269, pages 12395 - 12398,
    - OXVIG, C ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 2215 - 2220,
    - HUANG, C ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 19008 - 19016,
    - QU, A, STRUCTURE, (1996), vol. 4, pages 931 - 942,
    - LEITINGER, B ET AL., MOL BIOL CELL, (2000), vol. 11, pages 677 - 690,
    - EDWARDS, CP ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, pages 2893 7 - 28944,
    - CARSON, M, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 493 - 505,
    - MICHISHITA, M ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 857 - 867,
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453,
    - SMITH, D.B.; JOHNSON, K.S., Gene, PHARMACIA BIOTECH INC, vol. 67, pages 31 - 40,
    - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315,
    - STUDIER ET AL., Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 185, pages 60 - 89,
    - GOTTESMAN, S., Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 185, pages 119 - 128,
    - DRANSFIELD, I ET AL., EMBO J, (1989), vol. 8, pages 3759 - 3765,
    - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J, (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234,
    - STEWART, MP ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 156, pages 1810 - 1817,
    - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123,
    - ANDREW, D ET AL., EUR JLMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 23, pages 2217 - 2222,
    - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39,
    - SHATTIL, SJ ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1985), vol. 260, pages 11107 - 11114,
    - KAUFMAN ET AL., EMBO J, (1987), vol. 6, pages 187 - 195,
    - SAMBROOK, J.; FRITSH, E. F.; MANIATIS, T., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS,
    - CALAME; EATON, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275,
    - HUANG, C; SPRINGER, TA, JBIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 19008 - 19016,
    - QUEEN; BALTIMORE, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 741 - 748,
    - LEE, J-O ET AL., CELL, vol. 80, pages 631 - 638,
    - EDLUND ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 912 - 916,
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453,
    - CAMPES; TILGHMAN, GENES DEV., (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546,
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS,
    - R. H. KENNETH, Monoclonal Antibodies: A New Dimension In Biological Analyses, PLENUM PUBLISHING CORP.,
    - LI, E. ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, page 915,
    - BRADLEY, A., Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells:A Practical Approach, IRL, pages 113 - 152,
    - FUCHS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 1372,
    - LAKSO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6236,
    - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281,
    - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", ARNON ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., pages 243 - 56,
    - "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HELLSTROM ET AL., Controlled Drug Delivery, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., pages 623 - 53,
    - "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, pages 475 - 506,
    - "Analysis, Results, And Future Prospective Of The Therapeutic Use Of Radiolabeled Antibody In Cancer Therapy", Monoclonal Antibodies For Cancer Detection And Therapy, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 303 - 16,
    - GARRAD ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1373 - 1377,
    - KULVER, K. W., Gene Therapy, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC., page XII,
    - BARBAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982,
    - EICHELBAUM, M. ET AL., CLIN. EXP.PHARMACOL. PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 23, no. 10-11, pages 983 - 985,
    - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043,
    - KALLEN, J ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1999), vol. 292, pages 1 - 9,
    - LIU ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526,
    - SUN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 214 - 218,
    - VRIEND, G, JMOL GRAPH, (1990), vol. 8, pages 52 - 56,
    - WOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449,
    - SEED, B; ARUFFO, A, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3365 - 3369,
    - MORRISON, S. L., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207,
    - HORTON, RM ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1990), vol. 8, page 528,
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 552 - 525,
    - DUBRIDGE, RB ET AL., MOL CELL BIOI, (1987), vol. 7, pages 379 - 387,
    - BEIDLER ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060,
    - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 185,
    - SMITH, D.B.; JOHNSON, K. S., Gene, PHARMACIA BIOTECH INC, vol. 67, pages 31 - 40,
    - HALE, LP ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1989), vol. 32, pages 22 - 30,
    - MARTIN, S ET AL., J VIROL, (1993), vol. 67, pages 3561 - 3568,
    - SHIMAOKA, MET, NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 7, pages 674 - 678,
    - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165,
    - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, TLIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39,
    - SEED, B., NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840,
    - SAMBROOK, J.; FRITSH, E. F.; MANIATIS, T ., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS,
    - PINKERT ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 277,
    - WINOTO; BALTIMORE, EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733,
    - BANERJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 729 - 740,
    - BYRNE; RUDDLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5473 - 5477,
    - KESSEL; GRUSS, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS,
    - HOGAN, B., Manipulating the Mouse Embryo, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS,
    - THOMAS, K.R.; CAPECCHI, M. R., CELL, (1987), vol. 51, page 503,
    - BRADLEY, A., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 2, pages 823 - 829,
    - O'GORMAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 1351 - 1355,
    - LAM, K. S., ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1997), vol. 12, page 145,
    - DEWITT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, page 6909,
    - ERB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 11422,
    - ZUCKERMANN ET AL., J MED CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 2678,
    - CHO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1303,
    - CARRELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, page 2059,
    - CARELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, page 2061,
    - GALLOP ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 1233,
    - HOUGHTEN, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 412 - 421,
    - LAM, NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84,
    - FODOR, NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, pages 555 - 556,
    - CULL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1865 - 1869,
    - SCOTT; SMITH, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 386 - 390,
    - DEVLIN, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406,
    - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI., (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382,
    - FELICI, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 301 - 310,
    - "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies `84: Biological And Clinical Applications, pages 475 - 506,
    - THORPE ET AL., "The Preparation And Cytotoxic Properties Of Antibody-Toxin Conjugates", IMMUNOL. REV., (1982), vol. 62, pages 119 - 58,
    - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3054 - 3057,
    - LINDER, M.W. ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1997), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 254 - 266,
    - SALI, A; BLUNDELL, TL, J MOL BIOL, (1993), vol. 234, pages 779 - 815,
    - LEE, J-O ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1995), vol. 3, pages 13 3 3 - 1340,
    - HO, SN ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 77, pages 51 - 59,
    - LU, C; SPRINGER, TA, J IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 159, pages 268 - 278,
    - DUBRIDGE, RB ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1987), vol. 7, pages 379 - 387,
    - HEINZEL, SS ET AL., J VIROL, (1988), vol. 62, pages 3738 - 3746,
    - SANCHEZ-MADRID, F ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1982), vol. 79, pages 7489 - 7493,
    - HUANG, C; SPRINGER, TA, J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 19008 - 19016,
    - LU, C; SPRINGER, TA, JLMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 159, pages 268 - 278,
    - KNORR, R; DUSTIN, ML, JEXP MED, (1997), vol. 186, pages 719 - 730,
    - SHIMAOKA, M ET AL., NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 7, pages 674 - 678,