Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315734

EP1315734 - HYDROCARBON CORE POLYSULFIDE SILANE COUPLING AGENTS FOR FILLED ELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
General Electric Company
One River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Crompton Corporation
199 Benson Road
Middlebury, Connecticut 06749 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CRUSE, Richard, W.
171 Montross Road
Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01966637.904.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US28079
Priority number, dateUS2000065793408.09.2000         Original published format: US 657934
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0220534
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315734
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315734
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07F7/18, C08K5/548, C08L21/00
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:SILIZIUM-HALTIGE KUPPLUNGSREAGENZIEN MIT EINEM KOHLENWASSERSTOFFKERN FÜR GEFÜLLTE ELASTOMERENMISCHUNGEN[2003/23]
English:HYDROCARBON CORE POLYSULFIDE SILANE COUPLING AGENTS FOR FILLED ELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS[2003/23]
French:AGENTS DE COUPLAGE EN SILANES POLYSULFURES A NOYAU HYDROCARBURE POUR COMPOSITIONS ELASTOMERE CHARGEES[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2003National basic fee paid 
06.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
29.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2004Fee for grant paid
27.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.06.2004
CY30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
LU04.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
[2007/10]
Former [2005/22]CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/21]CH30.06.2004
LI30.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[DA]CA2231302  (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,17-19,27,32,37 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 19 * * page 16 - page 19; examples 11,12 *;
 [A]EP0819694  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1,17-19,27,32,37 * page 3, line 4 * * page 5 - page 9 *