blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1301693

EP1301693 - GAS EXCHANGE VALVE ARRANGEMENT AND VALVE SEAT CONSTRUCTION WITH A RING-SHAPED GROOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN B & W Diesel A/S
Teglholmsgade 41
2450 Copenhagen SV / DK
[2003/16]
Inventor(s)01 / JENSEN, Finn, Quordrup
Pilealle 5g
DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK
 [2003/16]
Representative(s)Munk, Ludwig
Patentanwälte Munk
Prinzregentenstrasse 3
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/16]Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1
86150 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date01967166.813.07.2001
[2003/16]
WO2001EP08099
Priority number, dateDE200013477318.07.2000         Original published format: DE 10034773
[2003/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0206640
Date:24.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1301693
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1301693
Date:09.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2002
ClassificationIPC:F01L3/22
[2003/16]
CPC:
F01L3/22 (EP,KR); F01L2820/01 (EP); F02F2007/0097 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GASWECHSELVENTILANORDNUNG UND VENTILSITZKONSTRUKTION MIT RINGFÖRMIGER NUT[2003/16]
English:GAS EXCHANGE VALVE ARRANGEMENT AND VALVE SEAT CONSTRUCTION WITH A RING-SHAPED GROOVE[2003/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SOUPAPE DE COMMUTATION DES GAZ ET CONCEPTION DE SIEGE DE SOUPAPE AVEC RAINURE ANNULAIRE[2003/16]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2002National basic fee paid 
21.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/16]
17.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2004Fee for grant paid
08.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.06.2004
FR09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
AT13.07.2004
LU13.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
[2007/10]
Former [2006/14]FR09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
AT13.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
Former [2006/13]IE09.06.2004
AT13.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
Former [2005/51]IE09.06.2004
BE31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
Former [2005/22]IE09.06.2004
MC31.07.2004
DK09.09.2004
Former [2005/19]IE09.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[XAY]JPS59196913  ;
 [XAY]JPS59190414  ;
 [A]JPH08135520  ;
 [A]FR1525285  (CITROEN SA ANDRE) [A] 1,13 * page 1, column 2, paragraphs 2,4 ** figure 1 *;
 [DXA]EP0024890  (B & W DIESEL AS [DK]) [DX] 1,4,9,11 * column 1, lines 1-12 * * column 4, lines 18-37 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,10;
 [Y]EP0771938  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,6 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 5, lines 32,33 * * figure 10 *;
 [PXA]WO0120154  (MAN B & W DIESEL AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1,3,4 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 8,9,11
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850320), vol. 009, no. 063, Database accession no. (M - 365), & JP59196913 A 19841108 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract * * figure 2 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 1,6
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850309), vol. 009, no. 055, Database accession no. (M - 362), & JP59190414 A 19841029 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5,7-10 [Y] 1,6
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08135520 A 19960528 (FUJI OOZX INC) [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * * figure 2 *
by applicantSU1768770
 EP0024890
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.