Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317393

EP1317393 - DISK BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.04.2006  [2006/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IROPA AG
Oberneuhofstrasse 6
6340 Baar / CH
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBSSON, Kurt, Arne, Gunnar
Stenasgatan 11
S-523 33 Ulricehamn / SE
02 / OHLSON, Per
Ringvägen 8
S-523 94 Tvärred / SE
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01967346.614.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001EP10670
Priority number, dateDE200014542014.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10045420
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222483
Date:21.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317393
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317393
Date:27.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65H59/22
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2004/21]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:TELLERBREMSE[2003/24]
English:DISK BRAKE[2003/24]
French:FREIN ANNULAIRE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2003National basic fee paid 
13.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
15.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2005Fee for grant paid
21.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9114032  (IRO AB [SE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19839272  (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5979810  (BARTH PETER [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * column W *;
 [A]US5782424  (HORVATH ATTILA [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W *