Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315757

EP1315757 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF EPI-HNE PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
Forum "après-demain" Chemin Messidor 5-7 Case Postale 5911
1002 Lausanne / CH
[2008/11]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
DEBIOPHARM S.A.
17, rue des Terreaux
1000 Lausanne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PONCIN, Alain
7, rue du Moulin
B-4100 Boncelles / BE
02 / SAUDUBRAY, Francois
Chemin des Tuilières 9 Studio 2
CH-1028 Preverenges / CH
03 / BOKMAN, Anne
Le Guercet 97
CH-1920 Martigny / CH
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Nargolwalla, Cyra
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Nargolwalla, Cyra
Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date01967348.230.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001EP10727
Priority number, dateEP2000020304904.09.2000         Original published format: EP 00203049
EP2000040302931.10.2000         Original published format: EP 00403029
EP2001020265510.07.2001         Original published format: EP 01202655
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0220613
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315757
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315757
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/81
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON EPI-HNE PROTEINEN[2003/23]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF EPI-HNE PROTEINS[2003/23]
French:PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE PROTEINES EPI-HNE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase22.04.2002National basic fee paid 
22.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.04.2002Examination requested  [2003/23]
26.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2007Fee for grant paid
22.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9620278  (PROTEIN ENG CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * examples 10-15 *