Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320724

EP1320724 - DISPLACEMENT AND FORCE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Wernerstrasse 1
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2008/19]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GmbH
Wernerstrasse 1
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FOURCADE, Jean
32, allée Paul Favier
F-77420 Champs sur Marne / FR
02 / GENDRIN, Stéphane
40, rue de Rennes
F-35170 Bruz / FR
03 / PASQUET, Thierry
29, rue Charles Péguy
F-93190 Livry Gargan / FR
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor
Bosch Systèmes de Freinage
Service Brevets
126, rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor
Bosch Systèmes de Freinage, 126, rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date01967431.606.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001FR02762
Priority number, dateFR2000001183715.09.2000         Original published format: FR 0011837
[2003/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0223135
Date:21.03.2002
Language:FR
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320724
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320724
Date:07.05.2008
Language:FR
[2008/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01D21/02, G01D5/20
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WEG- UND- KRAFTGEBER[2003/26]
English:DISPLACEMENT AND FORCE SENSOR[2003/26]
French:CAPTEUR DE DEPLACEMENT ET DE L'EFFORT[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2003National basic fee paid 
15.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
01.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2008Fee for grant paid
18.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.05.2008
CY07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
GB06.09.2008
LU06.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]AT07.05.2008
CY07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GB06.09.2008
LU06.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2010/34]AT07.05.2008
CY07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GB06.09.2008
LU06.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2010/32]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GB06.09.2008
LU06.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2010/01]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GB06.09.2008
BE30.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/49]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
BE30.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/32]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
BE30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/20]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0447017  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim - *;
 [A]US5541510  (DANIELSON TIM [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0511807  (GEC AVERY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *