Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320601

EP1320601 - HUMAN AND RAT PGC-3, PPAR-GAMMA COACTIVATIONS AND SPLICE VARIANTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Hart, Kevin Anthony
Alderley Park Macclesfield
Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
02 / Montague, Carl Thomas
Alderley Park Macclesfield
Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
03 / Vidal-Puig, Antonio Dept. of Clinical Biochem.
P.O.Box 232 Addenbrookes Hospital
Cambridge CB2 2QR / GB
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Gainey, Laurence David Scott , et al
AstraZeneca
Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Södartälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/03]Gainey, Laurence David Scott , et al
AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Södartälje / SE
Former [2003/26]Hudson, Janette Mary
AstraZeneca, Global Intellectual Property
151 85 Sodertalje / SE
Application number, filing date01967480.312.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001GB04074
Priority number, dateGB2000002267015.09.2000         Original published format: GB 0022670
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222818
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320601
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C07K14/575, C07K16/18, C12N5/10
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MENSCHLICHEN UND RATTEN PGC-3, PPAR-GAMMA KOAKTIVATOREN UND DESSEN SPLEISSVARIANTEN[2003/26]
English:HUMAN AND RAT PGC-3, PPAR-GAMMA COACTIVATIONS AND SPLICE VARIANTS THEREOF[2003/26]
French:PGC-3 D'HUMAIN ET DE RAT, COACTIVATIONS DE PPAR-GAMMA ET VARIANTS D'EPISSAGE DE CEUX-CI[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2003National basic fee paid 
15.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
16.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/49]
15.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0032215  (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [X] 2-4,9-14,17-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9854220  (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [X] 2-4,9-14,17-19 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO0157272  (MOLECULAR DYNAMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 2-4,9,10 * Probe #11389, SEQ ID No.: 11389 and claim 25 *;
 [PX]WO0157275  (MOLECULAR DYNAMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 2-4,9,10 * SEQ ID No.: 11070 and example 4 *
 [XD]  - P. PUIGSERVER ET AL.,, "A cold-inducible coactivator of nuclear receptors linked to adaptative thermogenesis", CELL, (19980320), vol. 92, pages 829 - 839, XP002188799 [XD] 2-4,9-14,17-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81410-5
 [X]  - "xm47f06.x1 NCI_CGAP_GC6 homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:2687363 3' similar to TR:070343 PPAR GAMMA COACTIVATOR 1", DATABASE EMBL, (19991215), XP002188800 [X] 2-4,9,10 * abstract *
 [X]  - "xf41h08.x1 NCI_CGAP_Brn50 omo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:2620671 3' similar to TR:070343 PPARGAMMA COACTIVATOR 1", DATABASE EMBL, (19991104), XP002188801 [X] 2-4,9,10 * abstract *