Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319905

EP1319905 - HUMIDIFIER AND AIR CONDITIONER USING THE HUMIDIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Tooru, c/o Shiga-seisakusho
DAIKIN IND., LTD, 1000-2, Aza Ootani, Okamoto-cho
Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0044 / JP
02 / MAEKAWA, Yasunori, c/o Shiga-seisakusho
DAIKIN IND., LTD, 1000-2, Aza Ootani, Okamoto-cho
Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0044 / JP
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01967718.618.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001JP08092
Priority number, dateJP2000028715821.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000287158
[2003/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0225183
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319905
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.03.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:F24F11/02, F24F6/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:LUFTBEFEUCHTER UND DIESEN LUFTBEFEUCHTER VERWENDENDE KLIMAANLAGE[2003/25]
English:HUMIDIFIER AND AIR CONDITIONER USING THE HUMIDIFIER[2003/25]
French:HUMIDIFICATEUR ET CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR UTILISANT CET HUMIDIFICATEUR[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2002Translation filed 
19.06.2002National basic fee paid 
19.06.2002Search fee paid 
19.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2002Examination requested  [2003/25]
15.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/30]
08.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
27.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
17.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
16.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[YA]JPH10267331  ;
 [Y]JPH0942709  ;
 [A]JPS6191428  ;
 [A]EP0939283  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029]; figures 1,2 *;
 [PA]JP2001091001
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10267331 A 19981009 (SHARP CORP) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 1
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09042709 A 19970214 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD; SHINKO KOGYO CO LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860911), vol. 010, no. 267, Database accession no. (M - 516), & JP61091428 A 19860509 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001091001 A 20010406 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [PA] 1,8 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH10267331  (SHARP KK);
 [Y]JPH05272792  ;
 [Y]JPH04208333  (MATSUSHITA SEIKO KK);
 [Y]JPH11241842  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO)