Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321405

EP1321405 - FILM ROLL BODY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING FILM ROLL BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? GB
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[2006/22]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MORIOKA, Satoko
7-21, Shugakuin Suijoden-cho, Sakyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8023 / JP
02 / ICHINOMIYA, Takashi
Toray Takatsuki-ryo, 1-9-1-, Kosobe-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1115 / JP
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date01967721.018.09.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001JP08099
Priority number, dateJP2000029898829.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000298988
[2003/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0228755
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321405
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321405
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.04.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:B65H18/16, B29C59/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FOLIENROLLENKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2003/26]
English:FILM ROLL BODY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING FILM ROLL BODY[2003/26]
French:CORPS DE ROULEAU DE FILM ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2002Translation filed 
23.05.2002National basic fee paid 
23.05.2002Search fee paid 
23.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2002Examination requested  [2003/26]
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2006Fee for grant paid
16.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.09.2006
[2007/50]
Former [2007/45]deleted
Former [2007/37]IT31.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2754179  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1-21 * page 10, paragraph 2; figure -; claims 1,2 *
International search[Y]JPS6374850  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]JPH10309749  (YOSHINO KASEI KK);
 [A]US5501905  (KRALLMANN ANTON [DE], et al);
 [A]US5436041  (MURSCHALL URSULA [DE], et al);
 [A]US5914079  (PEIFFER HERBERT [DE], et al);
 [A]JPH10175756  (UNITIKA LTD);
 [A]JPH08108474  (YOSHINO KASEI KK)