Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315487

EP1315487 - FLAVORING SYSTEMS FOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING SUCH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
Dept. 377/ AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALANI, Laman
1595 Meadowside Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
02 / GAUWITZ, Donald, P.
2504 South Lilac
McHenry, IL 60050 / US
03 / KAUL, Dilip
4334 Buckingham Drive
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
04 / LIPARI, John, M.
6600 Apollo Drive
Racine, WI 53406 / US
05 / GHOSH, Soumojeet
219 Dittmer Lane Apt 2A
Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US
06 / MARSH, Kennan, C.
1499 McKinley
Lake Forest, IL 60046 / US
07 / WHELAN, Richard, H.
46 Noon Hill Avenue
Norfolk, MA 02056 / US
08 / PETROSSIAN, Vanik, D.
71 East Quinobequin Road
Waban, MA 02468 / US
 [2003/36]
Former [2003/23]01 / ALANI, Laman
3015 Gates Court
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
02 / GAUWITZ, Donald, P.
2504 South Lilac
McHenry, IL 60050 / US
03 / KAUL, Dilip
4334 Buckingham Drive
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
04 / LIPARI, John, M.
6600 Apollo Drive
Racine, WI 53406 / US
05 / GHOSH, Soumojeet
219 Dittmer Lane Apt 2A
Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US
06 / MARSH, Kennan, C.
1499 McKinley
Lake Forest, IL 60046 / US
07 / WHELAN, Richard, H.
46 Noon Hill Avenue
Norfolk, MA 02056 / US
08 / PETROSSIAN, Vanik, D.
71 East Quinobequin Road
Waban, MA 02468 / US
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date01968449.704.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US27415
Priority number, dateUS2000065519205.09.2000         Original published format: US 655192
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0220057
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315487
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/425, A61K31/505, A61K9/10
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AROMASYSTEME FÜR PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2003/23]
English:FLAVORING SYSTEMS FOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING SUCH COMPOSITIONS[2003/23]
French:SYSTEME D'AROMATISATION POUR COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE TELLES COMPOSITIONS[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2003National basic fee paid 
05.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
23.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/39]
08.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9520384  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-69 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9746222  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-69 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - OHTA, YUKARI, ET AL., "New drugs - Reports of new drugs recently approved by the FDA: Ritonavir", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, gb, (1997), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 461 - 462, XP001061208 [X] 1,4,19,22-24,28,29,32,33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(96)00260-X
 [PX]  - ABBOTT LABORATORIES, "Norvir", PRODUCT LABELING, NORVIR, (200103), URL: http://www.rxabbott.com/hiv/norpi.htm, (20020211), XP002189994 [PX] 1,4,19,22-24,28,29,32,33 * the whole document *