Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317839

EP1317839 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY ENCRYPTING THE PAYLOAD PORTION OF MULTIMEDIA DATA SENT OVER A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2011/32]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2006/07]For all designated states
Widevine Technologies, Inc.
900 Fourth Avenue, Suite 3400
Seattle, WA 98164 / US
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
Widevine Technologies, Inc.
1301 5th Avenue Suite 1300
Seattle WA 98101 / US
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Widevine Technologies
1301 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1300
Seattle, WA 98101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOLLMYER, Brad
849 South Pine Court
Lynden, WA 98264 / US
02 / BAKER, Brian
900 4th Avenue, Suite 3400
Seattle, Washington 98164 / US
03 / SHAPIRO, Eric
3185 Appleridge Drive
Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US
04 / KOLLMYER, Aric
9032 East Shorewood Drive No.323
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
05 / RUTMAN, Mike
5825 NW 53rd Court
Gainesville, FL 32653 / US
06 / MACLEAN, Duncan
2807 3rd Street, No.2
Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US
07 / ROBERTSON, Dan
2595 Powell Avenue
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
08 / TAYLOR, Neal
18361 Avolinda Drive
Yorba Linda, CA 92686 / US
09 / HUNSCHE, Dick
2521 Emerald Avenue
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
10 / WALKER, Amanda
2111 Owls Cove Lane
Reston, VA 20191 / US
 [2003/43]
Former [2003/24]01 / KOLLMYER, Brad
849 South Pine Court
Lynden, WA 98264 / US
02 / BAKER, Brian
14631 NE 3rd Street, No.7
Bellevue, WA 98007 / US
03 / SHAPIRO, Eric
640 Avis Drive, Suite 300
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
04 / KOLLMYER, Aric
9032 East Shorewood Drive No.323
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
05 / RUTMAN, Mike
5825 NW 53rd Court
Gainesville, FL 32653 / US
06 / MACLEAN, Duncan
2807 3rd Street, No.2
Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US
07 / ROBERTSON, Dan
2595 Powell Avenue
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
08 / TAYLOR, Neal
18361 Avolinda Drive
Yorba Linda, CA 92686 / US
09 / HUNSCHE, Dick
2521 Emerald Avenue
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
10 / WALKER, Amanda
2111 Owls Cove Lane
Reston, VA 20191 / US
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[2019/03]
Former [2005/41]Carter, Stephen John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2005/39]Carter, Stephen John
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2003/24]Alton, Andrew
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date01968511.406.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US27518
Priority number, dateUS2000065616606.09.2000         Original published format: US 656166
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0221761
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317839
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317839
Date:19.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1317839
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2019/03]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN VERSCHLÜSSELUNG VON ÜBER EIN NETZWERK ZU ÜBERTRAGENDEN MULTIMEDIADATEN[2007/28]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY ENCRYPTING THE PAYLOAD PORTION OF MULTIMEDIA DATA SENT OVER A NETWORK[2003/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CHIFFREMENT SELECTIF DE DIFFERENTES PORTIONS DE DONNEES ENVOYEES PAR RESEAU[2007/28]
Former [2003/24]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN VON ÜBER EIN NETZWERK ÜBERTRAGENER SELEKTIVENVERSCHLÜSSELUNG NUTZMULTIMEDIENDATEN
Former [2003/24]APPAREIL, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CHIFFREMENT SELECTIF DE DIFFERENTES PORTIONS DE DONNEES ENVOYEES PAR RESEAU
Entry into regional phase03.04.2003National basic fee paid 
03.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
26.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2007
04.06.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.06.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2007Fee for grant paid
31.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07024445.4  / EP1916818
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.09.2008  12.09.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Opponent's representative
Brunner, John Michael Owen
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  17.09.2008  27.05.2015  WITHDRAWN
Nagravision SA
22, route de Genève
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Wenger, Joel-Théophile
Leman Consulting S.A.
Chemin de Précossy 31
1260 Nyon / CH
 [2015/27]
Former [2012/29]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2008  12.09.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Opponent's representative
Brunner, John Michael Owen
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  17.09.2008  13.11.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Nagravision SA
22, route de Genève
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Wenger, Joel-Théophile
Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31
1260 Nyon / CH
Former [2008/47]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2008  12.09.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
 02  17.09.2008   
Nagravision SA
22, route de Genève
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Wenger, Joel-Théophile
Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31
1260 Nyon / CH
Former [2008/41]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2008   
Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
20.11.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.06.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.12.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
17.04.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.05.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.09.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.11.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0478/13
22.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2017Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
09.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
01.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200707   M06   Fee paid on   01.11.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
IT06.09.2012
ES07.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
DK01.10.2012
NL01.04.2013
GR04.04.2013
TR06.09.2014
[2017/46]
Former [2016/07]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
IT06.09.2012
ES07.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
DK01.10.2012
NL01.04.2013
GR04.04.2013
Former [2013/49]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
TR06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
IT06.09.2012
ES07.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
DK01.10.2012
NL01.04.2013
GR04.04.2013
Former [2013/48]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
TR06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
IT06.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
DK01.10.2012
NL01.04.2013
GR04.04.2013
Former [2013/47]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
TR06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
IT06.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
NL01.04.2013
GR04.04.2013
Former [2013/37]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
IT06.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
PT06.03.2013
NL01.04.2013
GR04.04.2013
Former [2013/36]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
AT06.09.2012
FI06.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
PT06.03.2013
Former [2013/33]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FI06.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
PT06.03.2013
Former [2013/28]CY06.09.2011
LU06.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FI06.09.2012
SE07.09.2012
PT06.03.2013
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US5640456  (ADAMS JR RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10-15,17,18,20,29,30,36,39,42 * abstract * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 61 - column 8, line 63 * [A] 16,23,26,27,32-35,44-47 [Y] 2,7,9,19,21,22,24,25,28,31,37,38,40,41,43;
 [Y]US5883957  (MOLINE WILLIAM A [US], et al) [Y] 2,7,19,21,22,24,25,31,37,38,40,41,43 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 64 * * column 9, line 37 - line 67 * * column 18, line 61 - column 22, line 19 *;
 [Y]US5805705  (GRAY JAMES P [US], et al) [Y] 9,28 * abstract *