Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316086

EP1316086 - COMBINING DTW AND HMM IN SPEAKER DEPENDENT AND INDEPENDENT MODES FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / QI, Yingyong
6609 Maycrest Lane
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / BI, Ning
14209 Breezway Place
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
03 / GARUDADRI, Harinath
9435 Oviedo Street
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01968568.405.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US27625
Priority number, dateUS2000065776008.09.2000         Original published format: US 657760
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0221513
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316086
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316086
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/26
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION VON DIGITALER ZEITVERSCHIEBUNG UND HMM IN SPRECHERABHÄNGIGER- UND SPRECHERUNABHÄNGIGER WEISE FÜR DIE SPRACHERKENNUNG[2003/23]
English:COMBINING DTW AND HMM IN SPEAKER DEPENDENT AND INDEPENDENT MODES FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION[2003/23]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA VOIX PAR MAPPAGE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2003National basic fee paid 
06.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
04.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2006Fee for grant paid
18.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CY08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CY08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/20]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/04]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/37]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/30]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
Former [2007/28]AT08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5754978  (PEREZ-MENDEZ I [US], et al) [Y] 1-15,18-24,28-32 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5734793  (WANG SHAY-PING T [US]) [Y] 2-8,28-32 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0955628  (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [A] 1,6,8-10,18-20 * abstract *;
 [E]WO0207148  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-13,18-23,28-32 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - BOUCHAFFRA ET AL, "A METHODOLOGY FOR MAPPING SCORES TO PROBABILITIES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199909), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 923 - 927, XP000851870 [Y] 1,9-15,18-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.790432