Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316063

EP1316063 - LINE DRAWING FOR A VOLUMETRIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Actuality Systems, Inc.
315 Main Street, Suite 102
Reading, MA 01867 / US
[2007/31]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Actuality Systems, Inc.
315 Main Street, Suite 102
Reading, MA 01867 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIOVINCO, Michael, G.
12 Ivy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / NAPOLI, Joshua
816 First Avenue
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2004/26]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date01968598.107.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US27681
Priority number, dateUS20000230972P07.09.2000         Original published format: US 230972 P
US2001082877009.04.2001         Original published format: US 828770
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0221439
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316063
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316063
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06T1/00
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZEICHNEN VON LINIEN IN EINEM VOLUMETRISCHEN ANZEIGESYSTEM[2003/23]
English:LINE DRAWING FOR A VOLUMETRIC DISPLAY[2003/23]
French:DESSIN AU TRAIT POUR AFFICHAGE VOLUMETRIQUE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2003National basic fee paid 
28.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2007Fee for grant paid
13.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
IE07.09.2007
LU07.09.2007
IT30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
DE03.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/42]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
IE07.09.2007
LU07.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
DE03.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2009/37]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
IE07.09.2007
LU07.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
DE03.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2009/33]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
IE07.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
DE03.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2008/45]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
IE07.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
DE03.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2008/36]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
DE03.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2008/32]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
FR28.03.2008
Former [2008/28]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/26]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/22]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
MC30.09.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/20]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL01.08.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES12.11.2007
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6049317  (THOMPSON E EARLE [US], et al) [X] 15,30 * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 19; figures 5A,16 * * column 19, line 42 - column 20, line 65 * [A] 2-6,14,17-20,29;
 [X]US4983031  (SOLOMON DENNIS J [US]) [X] 15,30 * column 3, line 3 - line 53; figures 1,3; claim 1 *;
 [XA]US5148310  (BATCHKO ROBERT G [US]) [X] 15,30 * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 12 * [A] 2-14,16-29;
 [A]US5936767  (FAVALORA GREGG E [US]) [A] 1,7,16,22 * column 8, line 1 - line 10 *;
 [A]  - "OPTIMIZED DRAWING OF FILLED AND UNFILLED CIRCLES IN A TWO-DIMENSIONAL GRAPHICS SYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19901101), vol. 33, no. 6B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 291 - 295, XP000108875 [A] 13,28 * /* the whole document */ *
 [A]  - B. LACOTTE, "elimination of keystone and crosstalk effects in stereoscopic video", RAPPORT TECHNIQUE DE L'INRS-TELECOMMUNICATIONS. NO 95-31, quebec, canada, (19951222), pages 1 - 27, XP002190026 [A] 9,25 * page 10, line 3.2 - page 16, line 4 *