EP1316019 - MANAGING REPLACEMENT OF DATA IN A CACHE ON A NODE BASED ON CACHES OF OTHER NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94066 / US | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRUSCINO, ANGELO 436 Distel Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
BAMFORD, Roger 555 Manzanita Way Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 03 /
BRIDGE, William, Jr. 2969 Seaview Parkway Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 04 /
BROWER, David 18 Sandstone Court Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 05 /
MACNAUGHTON, Neil P.O. Box 1408 Los Gatos, CA 95031 / US | 06 /
WANG, Tak, Fung 826 Corrienta Pointe Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01968979.3 | 30.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US41965 | Priority number, date | US20000652384 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: US 652384 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0219115 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316019 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316019 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F12/12 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
G06F12/121 (EP,US);
G06F12/0813 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99954 (US)
|
Former IPC [2003/23] | G06F12/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER ERSETZUNG VON DATEN IN EINEM HILFSPEICHER AUF EINEM KNOTEN AUFGRUND DER HILFSPEICHERN ANDERER KNOTEN | [2003/23] | English: | MANAGING REPLACEMENT OF DATA IN A CACHE ON A NODE BASED ON CACHES OF OTHER NODES | [2003/23] | French: | GESTION DU REMPLACEMENT DES DONNEES EN ANTEMEMOIRE DANS UN NOEUD SUR LA BASE DESANTEMEMOIRES DES AUTRES NOEUDS | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06110798.3 / EP1667026 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CH | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | LI | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | LU | 30.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
LU | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5297269 (DONALDSON DARREL D [US], et al) [X] 12-15 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 2 * * column 5, line 52 - line 60 * [A] 1-11,16-22; | [XA]US5680576 (LAUDON JAMES P [US]) [X] 1-11,16-22 * column 8, line 29 - column 14, line 15; figures 7,9 * [A] 12-15; | [XA]US5829032 (KOMURO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 12-15 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 3; figures 12,16 * * column 17, line 9 - column 18, line 28 *[A] 1-11,16-22; | [XA]US6092157 (SUZUKI SHIGEO [JP]) [X] 1-11,16-22 * The document is cited against the unity of invention; column 6, line 23 - column 9, line 19; figure 3 * [A] 12-15; | [XA] - FEELEY M J ET AL, "IMPLEMENTING GLOBAL MEMORY MANAGEMENT IN A WORKSTATION CLUSTER", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW (SIGOPS), ACM HEADQUARTER. NEW YORK, US, (19951201), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 201 - 212, XP000584826 [X] 1-11,16-22 * page 202, column R, paragraph 2 - page 204, column L, paragraph 3 * [A] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/224057.224072 |