Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317398

EP1317398 - THIN FILM MEMS SENSORS EMPLOYING ELECTRICAL SENSING AND FORCE FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.03.2007
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IC Mechanics, Inc.
425 N. Craig Street, Suite 500
Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / CARLEY, L., Richard
Glen Mitchell Road
Sewickley, PA 15143 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing.
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date01969018.912.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US42124
Priority number, dateUS2000065996112.09.2000         Original published format: US 659961
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0222494
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317398
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B81B3/00
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DÜNNFILM-MEMS-SENSORE, DIE ELEKTRISCHE MESSVORRICHTUNGEN UND KRAFTRÜCKKOPPLUNG VERWENDEN[2003/24]
English:THIN FILM MEMS SENSORS EMPLOYING ELECTRICAL SENSING AND FORCE FEEDBACK[2003/24]
French:DETECTEURS DE SYSTEMES MICROELECTROMECANIQUES A COUCHES MINCES UTILISANT LA DETECTION ELECTRIQUE ET LE RETOUR D'EFFORT[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2003National basic fee paid 
26.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
25.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2006
25.10.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.10.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/16]
11.12.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200404   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2005
30.09.200505   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9114285  (DRAPER LAB CHARLES S [US]) [X] 1-16,19-24 * figures 1-6 * * page 4, line 22 - page 16, line 13 * [A] 17,18,25-30;
 [XA]WO9305401  (DRAPER LAB CHARLES S [US]) [X] 1,2,4-16,19-24 * figures 1,3,5-7,10-21 * * page 5, line 21 - page 14, line 19 * * page 17, line 3 - page 27, line 6 * [A] 3,17,18,25-30;
 [XA]US5331852  (GREIFF PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-16,19-24 * figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 64 * [A] 2,17,18,25-30;
 [XA]US5874675  (EDMANS DANIEL M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 32 - column 5, line 12 * [A] 3-13,15-30
 [XA]  - GIANCHANDANI Y B ET AL, "A MEMS-first fabrication process for integrating CMOS circuits with polysilicon microstructures", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, 1998. MEMS 98. PROCEEDINGS., THE ELEVENTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON HEIDELBERG, GERMANY 25-29 JAN. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980125), ISBN 0-7803-4412-X, pages 257 - 262, XP010270188 [X] 1,3-7,12-16,19,20 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [00II] * [A] 2,8-11,17,18,21-30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.1998.659764
Examination EP0582797
  EP0547742
    - WEIJIE YUN; HOWE R T; GRAY P R: "Surface micromachined, digitally force-balanced accelerometer with integrated CMOS detection circuitry" 22 June 1992 (1992-06-22), XP010056370

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SOLSEN.1992.228309
    - LEMKIN M A; BOSER B E; AUSLANDER D; SMITH J H: "A 3-axis force balanced accelerometer using a single proof-mass" 16 June 1997 (1997-06-16), XP010240691

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.1997.635417