Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1331493

EP1331493 - RADIATION DETECTING DEVICE FOR NUCLEAR MEDICINE DIAGNOSIS DEVICE AND DETECTING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385 Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi
Tochigi-ken / JP
[2016/33]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OGAWA, Koichi
15-1, Nakano 3-chome
Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-0001 / JP
02 / TAKAYAMA, Takuzo, K. K. TOSHIBA, NASU KOJO
1385-1, Aza Higashiyama, Shimoishigami
Ohtawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP
 [2003/31]
Representative(s)Moreland, David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]Granleese, Rhian Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date01970329.701.10.2001
[2003/31]
WO2001JP08656
Priority number, dateJP2000030470504.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000304705
[2003/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0229438
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1331493
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2003/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.04.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/29
[2007/11]
Former International [2003/31]G01T1/161
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2003/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE NUKLEARMEDIZIN-DIAGNOSEEINRICHTUNG UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2003/31]
English:RADIATION DETECTING DEVICE FOR NUCLEAR MEDICINE DIAGNOSIS DEVICE AND DETECTING METHOD THEREFOR[2003/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE RAYONNEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC DE MEDECINE NUCLEAIRE ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION ASSOCIE[2003/31]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2003Translation filed 
25.04.2003National basic fee paid 
25.04.2003Search fee paid 
25.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
25.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/31]
28.04.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.03.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination02.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1606/15
03.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP16198722.7  / EP3153889
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.03.2014Request for further processing filed
20.03.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.04.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
10.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
10.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2759837  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,16 * page 4, line 16 - page 12, line 16; figure 2c * [Y] 6,14;
 [X]JPH07104072  (SHIMADZU CORP) [X] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [Y]GB2231474  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [Y] 6,14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0637759  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 2,10 * page 1, line 7 - line 32 *;
 [A]WO9708569  (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]; DENDY PHILIP PALIN [GB]; WRAIGHT EDWIN PHILIP) [A] 2,10 * page 12, line 6 - line 14 *
International search[Y]JPH11304926  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH11337647  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]WO9309447  (UNIV TEXAS [US])
by applicantUS6329658
 JPH07104072B