Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1309879

EP1309879 - AUTOMOTIVE RADAR SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Radar Systems, Inc.
46 River Road
Hudson, NH 03051 / US
[2009/11]
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
141 Spring Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOODINGTON, Walter, Gordon
222 Concord Road
Lincoln, MA 01773 / US
02 / DELCHECCOLO, Michael, Joseph
4 Chesapeake Drive
Westford, MA 01866 / US
03 / PLEVA, Joseph, S.
16 Rossini Drive
Londonderry, NH 03053 / US
04 / RUSSELL, Mark, E.
5 Buckboard Drive
Westford, MA 01866 / US
05 / VAN REES, H., Barteld
42 Pinewood Road
Needham, MA 02492 / US
06 / HANSON, James, T.
8 Ethelyn Circle
Maynard, MA 01754 / US
 [2003/20]
Representative(s)Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
VIC-E-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
[2011/46]
Former [2003/20]Jackson, David Spence
REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road
London, WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date01970540.916.08.2001
[2003/20]
WO2001US25642
Priority number, dateUS20000226160P16.08.2000         Original published format: US 226160 P
[2003/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0214891
Date:21.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1309879
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002
[2003/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01S1/00
[2003/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2003/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KRAFTFAHRZEUG-RADARSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN[2003/20]
English:AUTOMOTIVE RADAR SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES[2003/20]
French:TECHNIQUES ET SYSTEMES RADAR POUR AUTOMOBILES[2003/20]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2003National basic fee paid 
10.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
26.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/07]
27.10.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.08.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/07]
Appeal following examination09.01.2012Appeal received No.  T0359/12
04.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
30.08.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
30.08.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.09.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP07016165.8  / EP1879045
EP07018061.7  / EP1870728
EP07018062.5  / EP1870729
EP07018063.3  / EP1870730
EP07018064.1  / EP1873551
EP07020591.9  / EP1879046
EP07020593.5  / EP1879047
EP08006341.5  / EP1939648
EP08075061.5  / EP1912080
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
17.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
13.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
19.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
25.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
24.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
25.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
29.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US5757307  (FUJITA AKIHISA ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-6,12,13,15-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 17 * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 18 * [A] 7,18 [Y] 3,14;
 [YDA]US5929802  (RUSSELL MARK E ET AL) [YD] 3,14,33 * abstract * * column 4, line 43 - column 8, line 38 * * column 11, line 65 - column 14, line 36 * [A] 1,12,24,34,40;
 [A]DE19850128  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - line 46 * * page 4, line 8 - line 39 *;
 [YA]EP0932052  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 10,21 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * [A] 1,12;
 [XAY]US6069581  (LI JIMMY MOON KAN ET AL) [X] 8,9,11,19,20,22 * abstract * * column 18, line 10 - column 20, line 25 * [A] 41-47 [Y] 10,21;
 [XAY]US5252981  (GREIN NICOLAS ET AL) [X] 23,28,30,34,35,40 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 8 * * column 5, line 46 - line 57 * [A] 24,27,29,36 [Y] 25,26,31,33;
 [XA]EP0887658  (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG ;ROSEMOUNT INC (US)) [X] 23-25,40 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - column 5, line 9 * [A] 28,34;
 [YA]DE19523693  (THOMSON CSF) [Y] 25,26 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 39 * [A] 27,29,40;
 [A]US5719580  (CORE MARK TAYLOR) [A] 23,28,33,34,40 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 61 *;
 [XAY]US6052080  (MAGORI VALENTIN) [X] 37 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 63 * * column 5, line 32 - line 53 * [A] 32,38-40 [Y] 31;
 [A]US6028548  (FARMER MICHAEL E) [A] 31,32,34,37-40 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 11 *;
 [A]DE19632889  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 34,36 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US5940011  (AGRAVANTE HIROSHI H ET AL) [X] 41-47 * the whole document * [A] 8,19