Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315670

EP1315670 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS GAS WITH LANTHANIDE-PROMOTED RHODIUM CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/23]LANTHANIDE-PROMOTED RHODIUM CATALYSTS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS GAS
[2007/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConocoPhillips Company
600 North Dairy Ashford (77079-1175)
P.O. Box 4783
Houston, Texas 77210-4783 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
ConocoPhillips Company
600 North Dairy Ashford
Houston, TX 77079 / US
Former [2003/29]For all designated states
Conocophillips Company
600 North Dairy Ashford
Houston, TX 77079 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Conoco Inc.
P.O.Box 4783
Houston, TX 77210-4783 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALLISON, Joe, D.
1000 South Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
02 / SWINNEY, Larry, D.
1000 South Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
03 / NIU, Tianyan
1000 South Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
04 / RICKETSON, Kevin, L.
1000 South Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
05 / WANG, Daxiang
1000 Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
06 / RAMANI, Sriram
1000 Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
07 / STRAGUZZI, Gloria, I.
1000 Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
08 / MINAHAN, David, M.
1000 Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
09 / WRIGHT, Harold, A.
1000 Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
10 / HU, Baili
1000 Pine Street RW
Ponca City, OK 74602-1267 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Thomson, James Burgess
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Thomson, James B.
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date01970632.405.09.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US27450
Priority number, dateUS20000229595P05.09.2000         Original published format: US 229595 P
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0220395
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315670
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315670
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/38, C01B3/40, B01J23/63, B01J23/46
[2003/41]
Former International [2003/23]C01B3/38, C01B3/40, B01J23/63
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SYNTHESEGAS MIT LANTHANID-DOTIERTER RHODIUMKATALYSATOREN[2007/02]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS GAS WITH LANTHANIDE-PROMOTED RHODIUM CATALYSTS[2007/02]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GAZ DE SYNTHESE AVEC DES CATALYSEURS AU RHODIUM A ACTIVITE STIMULEE PAR LANTHANIDE[2007/02]
Former [2003/23]LANTHANID-DOTIERTER RHODIUMKATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SYNTHESEGAS
Former [2003/23]LANTHANIDE-PROMOTED RHODIUM CATALYSTS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS GAS
Former [2003/23]CATALYSEURS AU RHODIUM A ACTIVITE STIMULEE PAR LANTHANIDE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GAZ DE SYNTHESE
Entry into regional phase05.03.2003National basic fee paid 
05.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2007Fee for grant paid
03.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27]
Request for further processing for:25.01.2005Request for further processing filed
25.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.02.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
CY25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
TR25.07.2007
IE05.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/33]AT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
CY25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
IE05.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/45]AT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
IE05.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/28]AT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
MC30.09.2007
SE25.10.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/22]AT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
DK25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
MC30.09.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/20]AT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
GR26.10.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/13]AT25.07.2007
CH25.07.2007
FI25.07.2007
LI25.07.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/10]FI25.07.2007
ES05.11.2007
PT26.12.2007
Former [2008/08]ES05.11.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9616737  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1-51,69-81,83,84,102-146 * examples 2,4,5,7 *;
 [X]WO9948805  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,8,20,69 * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0640561  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 25-43,47-51 * examples 1,4; claims 1-13 *;
 [X]EP0974551  (CHIYODA CHEM ENG CONSTRUCT CO [JP]) [X] 102,104-107,112-117 * example 7 *;
 [X]US5023276  (YARRINGTON ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1,25,69,102 * column 5 - column 7 *;
 [X]EP0333037  (IGARASHI AKIRA C O KOHGAKUIN U) [X] 102-119 * examples 4-7 *