Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317363

EP1317363 - ROUGH ROAD DETECTION USING SUSPENSION SYSTEM INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY
12000 Tech Center Drive
Livonia, MI 48150 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / BARRON, Richard, J.
3407 Cromwell Court
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / MILOT, Danny, R.
2366 Hickory Point Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
03 / DOLL, Kenneth, A.
2464 Cliffside Court
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
04 / KEEN, Steven, Dale
Emser Landstrasse 17D
56112 Lahnstein / DE
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2015/21]
Former [2003/24]Beyer, Andreas, Dr.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01970718.107.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US28201
Priority number, dateUS2000065902809.09.2000         Original published format: US 659028
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0220319
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317363
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317363
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/17, B60G17/015
[2014/49]
Former International [2003/24]B60T8/00, B60G17/015
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2015/21]
Former [2004/20]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHLECHTWEGERKENNUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VON DATEN DES RADAUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEMS[2003/24]
English:ROUGH ROAD DETECTION USING SUSPENSION SYSTEM INFORMATION[2003/24]
French:DETECTION DE MAUVAISE ROUTE FAISANT APPEL AUX INFORMATIONS DU SYSTEME DE SUSPENSION[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2003National basic fee paid 
08.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
30.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2015Fee for grant paid
09.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2006
Opposition(s)23.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
[2016/21]
Former [2015/50]ES20.05.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0006433  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 24 - page 9, line L; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0449118  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-8 * column 8, line 19 - column 14, line 5; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4133238  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column W *;
 [PA]DE19946463  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1-8 * column 4, line 5 - line 11 *;
 [A]EP0655362  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 21, line 57 - column 25, line 48; figures 11-15 *