Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317767

EP1317767 - METHOD FOR SELECTIVE METAL FILM LAYER REMOVAL USING CARBON DIOXIDE JET SPRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOC, INC.
575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill
New Jersey 07974 / US
[2007/08]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
BOC, INC.
575 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Eco-Snow Systems, Inc.
4935 A Southfront Road
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOWERS, Charles, W.
1632 Scenic Avenue
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Wickham, Michael , et al
C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Wickham, Michael , et al
C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Former [2004/06]Wickham, Michael , et al
The BOC Group plc, Chertsey Road
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Former [2003/24]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date01970888.212.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US28568
Priority number, dateUS2000066035412.09.2000         Original published format: US 660354
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0223602
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317767
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317767
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/027, H01L21/3213
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SELEKTIVEN ENTFERNEN EINER METALLSCHICHT MITTELS STRAHLEN MIT KOHLENDIOXID[2003/24]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTIVE METAL FILM LAYER REMOVAL USING CARBON DIOXIDE JET SPRAY[2003/24]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT L'ELIMINATION SELECTIVE DE COUCHE DE FILM METALLIQUE GRACE A UNE PULVERISATION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase09.04.2003National basic fee paid 
09.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
11.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2006Fee for grant paid
17.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
TR21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
LU12.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
LU12.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2009/33]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/22]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/20]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
Former [2007/39]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
Former [2007/37]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4631250  (HAYASHI CHIKARA [JP]) [DA] 1,8,13 * column 1, lines 1-25 * * column 3, lines 8-12 * * column 4, lines 4-16; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]US4871651  (MCCUNE JR ROBERT C [US], et al) [DA] 1,2 * column 2, lines 19-34 * * column 2, lines 56-59 *;
 [DA]US5315793  (PETERSON RONALD V [US], et al) [DA] 1-3,8-14 * column 2, lines 29-67 * * column 3, lines 62-64 *;
 [A]US5931721  (ROSE PETER H [US], et al) [A] 1,8-14 * column 7, lines 19-31 * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 3 * * column 8, lines 52-55; figures 7,13 *