Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318726

EP1318726 - ACIDULANT SYSTEM FOR MARINADES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2011  [2011/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRIFFITH LABORATORIES WORLDWIDE, INC.
One Griffith Center
Alsip, IL 60803-3495 / US
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / FORMANEK, Joseph, A.
184 Brookwood Lane West
Bolingbrook, IL 60440 / US
02 / TANG, Pamela
402 Bridgeway Court
Oak Brook, IL 60523 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Curtis, Philip Anthony , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Curtis, Philip Anthony , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date01970896.514.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001US28601
Priority number, dateUS2000066580220.09.2000         Original published format: US 665802
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0224003
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318726
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.06.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/221, A23B4/12, A23L1/33, A23L1/325, A23L1/318
[2006/46]
Former International [2003/25]A23L1/221
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SAEUERUNGSMITTEL FUER MARINADEN[2003/25]
English:ACIDULANT SYSTEM FOR MARINADES[2003/25]
French:AGENT ACIDULANT POUR MARINADES[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2003National basic fee paid 
26.03.2003Search fee paid 
26.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
30.05.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/23]
24.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/23]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2007
Request for further processing for:02.11.2007Request for further processing filed
02.11.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.01.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200303   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0940090  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0022] , [0024]; examples 1-6 * * claim 15 *;
 [X]JPH09209  (KITEII KK) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5436017  (LUDWIG WOLFGANG [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 30 * * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]DE831488  (HERBERT METZNER DR, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]  HOUBEN J H ET AL, "EFFECT OF CITRIC ACID, CITRATE AND SLIGHT AW DECREASES ON THE BACTERIOLOGICAL STABILITY OF HAGUE LIVER SAUSAGE", MEAT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (1988), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0309-1740, pages 163 - 176, XP001079561 [X] 1-16 * page 166 - page 174 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0309-1740(88)90075-7
 [X]  DASIEWICZ K ET AL, "Effect of added citric acid and sugar on the properties of pickled meat.", GOSPODARKA MIESNA, (1996), vol. 48, no. 11, page 24, 26-28, XP002288633 [X] 1-16 * abstract *
 [X]  FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE (FSIS), "Use of Sodium Citrate Buffered with Citric acid in certain cured and uncured Processed Meat and Poultry Products", FEDERAL REGISTER, vol. 61, no. 80, (19960424), pages 18047 - 18049, URL: wais.access.gpo.gov, (20060515), XP002400911 [X] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [T]  CITRIC BUFFER CALCULATION, BARTON/CLYMER, URL: http://www.columbia.edu/~scb2001/tools/citric/cit.htm, (20060928), XP002400912 [T] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5693359  (WOOD ROBERT W [US]);
 [A]US5562943  (KOH HEN-SIK [JP], et al);
 [A]US5324534  (STEVENS JOHN F [US], et al);
 [A]US5104679  (JURCSO JOHN F [US]);
 [A]US4944957  (KINGSLEY I STEVEN [US], et al);
 [A]US4927657  (ANTAKI JAMES M [US], et al);
 [A]US4299856  (ZIRBEL RICHARD);
 [A]US4258072  (EGUCHI HAJIME, et al);
 [A]US4241095  (MASAI HIROSHI [JP], et al)