Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317359

EP1317359 - Active brake control system and adaptive cruise control integration. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/24]ACTIVE BRAKE CONTROL SYSTEM AND ADAPTIVE CRUISE CONTROL INTEGRATION
[2011/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2012
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.08.2012  [2012/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY
12000 Tech Center Drive
Livonia, MI 48150 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / MILOT, Danny, R.
2366 Hickory Point Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / BARRON, Richard, J.
3407 Cromwell Court
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/35]Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2003/24]Beyer, Andreas, Dr.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01971400.507.09.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US42054
Priority number, dateUS2000065902709.09.2000         Original published format: US 659027
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0220296
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317359
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317359
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60W30/16
[2011/35]
Former International [2003/24]B60K31/00, B60T8/00, B60T8/32, B60T13/66, // B60K28:16
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Integration von aktiver Bremsregelung und adaptiver Geschwindigkeitsregelung.[2011/05]
English:Active brake control system and adaptive cruise control integration.[2011/05]
French:Système de régulation active des freins et intégration d'un régulateur de vitesse adaptif.[2011/05]
Former [2003/24]INTEGRATION VON AKTIVER BREMSREGELUNG UND ADAPTIVER GESCHWINDIGKEITSREGELUNG
Former [2003/24]ACTIVE BRAKE CONTROL SYSTEM AND ADAPTIVE CRUISE CONTROL INTEGRATION
Former [2003/24]SYST ME DE R GULATION ACTIVE DES FREINS ET INT GRATION UN R GULATEUR DE VITESSE ADAPTATIF
Entry into regional phase08.04.2003National basic fee paid 
08.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
20.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2011Fee for grant paid
28.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2007
Opposition(s)01.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0965477  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,11,19 * claims 2,5 *;
 [X]EP1020315  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claim 6 *;
 [X]EP0896896  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claim 2 *;
 [A]EP0720928  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 6,7,10,14,15,21,22,24 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5969640  (TIMM KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 7,15,22,23 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]EP1070624  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1,11-14,19,20 * claims 1,12 *;
 [PX]EP1127728  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1 * claim 2 *
by applicantEP0965477
 EP1020315
 EP0896896