Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318728

EP1318728 - LOW SIDESTREAM SMOKE CIGARETTE WITH NON-COMBUSTIBLE TREATMENT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2007  [2007/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc.
1500 Don Mills Road North York (Toronto)
Ontario M3B 3L1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Rothmans, Benson & Hedges Inc.
1500 Don Mills Road
North York (Toronto), Ontario M3B 3L1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SNAIDR, Stanislav, M.
4155 Sharonton Court
Mississauga, Ontario L5L 1Y9 / CA
02 / BECKER, E., Robert
808 Maple Glen Lane
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/30]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2006/20]McDonough, Jonathan , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2006/10]Browne, Robin Forsythe
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2003/25]Orr, William McLean
URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date01971573.918.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001CA01324
Priority number, dateUS20000233440P18.09.2000         Original published format: US 233440 P
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0224006
Date:28.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318728
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A24D1/02
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesAL17.03.2003
LT17.03.2003
LV17.03.2003
MK17.03.2003
RO17.03.2003
SI17.03.2003
TitleGerman:ZIGARETTE MIT GERINGEM SEITENSTRÖMUNSGRAUCH UND UNBRENNBAREM BEHANDLUNGSGUT[2003/25]
English:LOW SIDESTREAM SMOKE CIGARETTE WITH NON-COMBUSTIBLE TREATMENT MATERIAL[2003/25]
French:CIGARETTE A FAIBLE INDUCTION DE TABAGISME PASSIF A MATERIAU TRAITANT NON COMBUSTIBLE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2003National basic fee paid 
17.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
12.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/40]
12.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9816125  (ROTHMANS BENSON & HEDGES [CA], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-6,16,20,21,30-33,36,38-40,46,47,56-59,61-64,67-70 * page 12, line 33 - page 13, line 4 * * page 28, line 26 - page 29, line 21 * * page 31, line 25 - line 27 * * page 32, line 20 - page 33, line 7 * * claims 1-27 *;
 [DA]WO9953778  (ROTHMANS BENSON & HEDGES [CA]) [DA] 1-73 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4433697  (CLINE WARREN K [US], et al) [AD] 1-73 * example -; claim - *