Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320974

EP1320974 - DIGITAL DIRECTORY FOR USE IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.08.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vodafone Holding GmbH
Mannesmannufer 2
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / HERTLE, Jochen
Leharweg 5
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
02 / LANG, Thomas
Humboldt Strasse 24
81543 München / DE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Former [2003/26]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date01971664.629.08.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001DE03297
Priority number, dateDE200014865326.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10048653
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0228049
Date:04.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320974
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320974
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W80/00, H04L12/58
[2014/20]
Former International [2003/26]H04L29/06, H04Q7/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:DIGITALES VERZEICHNIS FÜR SOFORTIGEN BERICHTENDIENST[2003/26]
English:DIGITAL DIRECTORY FOR USE IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[2003/26]
French:REPERTOIRE ELECTRONIQUE A UTILISER DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2003National basic fee paid 
21.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
05.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
20.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
20.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2014Fee for grant paid
19.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.09.2006
Opposition(s)02.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
GR02.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2016/18]CY01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
GR02.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
GR02.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
GR02.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
GR02.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
GR02.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]NL01.10.2014
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/16]NL01.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - ANONYMOUS, "Tegic Communications Extends Instant Messaging to Wireless Phones with Next Generation of T9® Text Input Software", INTERNET ARTICLE, (19990727), URL: http://www.tegic.com/pressreleases/pr_instantmessaging.html, (20020522), XP002199725 [Y] 1-4,6,8-13,15-24,26-34 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MOHR G ET AL, ", PIP-DEMO: An Interoperable Presence Information Protocol", IETF INTERNET-DRAFT, (199808), XP002173457 [Y] 1-4,6,8-13,15-24,26-34 * page 2, line 30 - line L * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 12 *
 [A]  - DAY M ET AL, "A Model for Presence and Instant Messaging", IETF RFC 2778, (200002), XP002199726 [A] 1-34 * page 9, line 16 - page 15, line 6 *