Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238202

EP1238202 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.08.2007  [2007/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2006/34]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SENGER, Karl-Heinz
28441 Golfpointe
48331 Farminton Hills / US
02 / BAEUERLE, Peter
Balinger Strasse 24
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
03 / VEENHUIZEN, Bram
St. Jacobslaan 39
NL-5051 ED Goirle / NL
04 / SPIJKER, Engbert
Roerdompstrasse 6
NL-5702 LG Helmond / NL
05 / VAN SPIJK, Gert-Jan
Julianastraat 31
NL-5151 VT Drunen / NL
 [2002/37]
Application number, filing date01971685.131.08.2001
[2002/37]
WO2001DE03357
Priority number, dateDE200014575715.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10045757
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0223059
Date:21.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238202
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238202
Date:23.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16D48/06
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER KUPPLUNG[2002/37]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A CLUTCH[2002/37]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPLOITATION D'UN EMBRAYAGE[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2002National basic fee paid 
23.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
24.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2006Fee for grant paid
04.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19751455  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column W *;
 [X]US5630773  (SLICKER JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 7, line 31 - column 853 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [A]DE19504847  (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 12, line 56 - line 60 * * figures 3,4,10 * * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 8 * * page 16, line 68 - page 17, line 43 *