blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1340276 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1340276



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 844
14.03.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 27
06.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 15
22.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.11.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
14.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2016 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
13.10.2016 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 2
13.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.10.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
10.10.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 10
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 11
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 10
07.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 5
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 9
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 9
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 5
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 10
07.10.2016 Claims Appeal 4
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 5
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
06.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
06.06.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
01.06.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.12.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
16.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
30.06.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 6
29.01.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
18.01.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 1
05.10.2012 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
05.10.2012 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2012 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 77
11.05.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.05.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
05.03.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.01.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
16.01.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
13.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.01.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.01.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
27.12.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
27.12.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.12.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
27.12.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
27.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Claims Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Claims Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Claims Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
20.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
13.05.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.05.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2010 Claims Opposition 6
05.03.2010 Claims Opposition 5
05.03.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.03.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
28.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.10.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 21
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
30.10.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.10.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
23.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
22.09.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.09.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.06.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.06.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.06.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.06.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
14.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 6
14.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
14.12.2006 Description Search / examination 7
14.12.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.08.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.08.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.10.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
27.10.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
27.10.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
23.09.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.09.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
03.05.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.2004 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2004 General enquiry Search / examination 1
23.07.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.07.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.06.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.06.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
05.06.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
02.05.2003 Annex Search / examination 5
02.05.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
02.05.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 13
02.05.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.03.2003 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
13.03.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
13.03.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.03.2003 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.03.2003 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.03.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.03.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.03.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
03.03.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.02.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.02.2003 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.02.2003 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.02.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.02.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.02.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
04.02.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.01.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.12.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.12.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.12.2002 Written opinion - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.06.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.06.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.05.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
29.04.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
19.04.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2002 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
19.10.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.10.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 5
19.10.2001 Description International Searching Authority 15
19.10.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 6