Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1421820

EP1421820 - SCALABLE, MODULAR, STRICTLY NON-BLOCKING ELECTRO-OPTICAL CROSS CONNECT CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/22]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / TESTA, Francesco
Via Tito Livio, 13 (scala B)
I-00040 Pomezia (RM) / IT
02 / TOMEI, Fabio
Via Erminio, 13
I-00174 Rome / IT
 [2005/40]
Former [2004/22]01 / TESTA, Francesco
Piazza Aldo Moro, 22/C
I-00040 Pomezia / IT
02 / TOMEI, Fabio
Via Erminio, 13
I-00174 Rome / IT
Representative(s)Faggioni, Carlo Maria , et al
Fumero S.r.l.
Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Faggioni, Carlo Maria , et al
Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2004/39]Faggioni, Carlo Maria, Dr. Ing. , et al
Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2004/22]Vatti, Paolo, Dr. Ing. , et al
Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01972449.131.08.2001
[2004/22]
WO2001IT00453
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03019975
Date:06.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1421820
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003
[2004/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1421820
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/00, H04L12/56
[2004/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SKALIERBARER, MODULÄRER, STRINGENT BLOCKIERUNGSFREIER ELEKTRO-OPTISCHER QUERVERBINDUNGSKERN[2004/22]
English:SCALABLE, MODULAR, STRICTLY NON-BLOCKING ELECTRO-OPTICAL CROSS CONNECT CORE[2004/22]
French:MODULE DE BRASSEUR OPTIQUE ECHELONNABLE, MODULAIRE ET STRICTEMENT IMBLOCABLE D'INTERCONNEXIONS ELECTRO-OPTIQUES[2004/22]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2004National basic fee paid 
22.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/22]
24.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2006Fee for grant paid
23.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
CY12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
TR12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE31.08.2006
LU31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
TR12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE31.08.2006
LU31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2008/20]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
GR13.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/42]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
IE31.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/37]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
IT12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/19]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
NL12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
MC31.08.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/13]AT12.04.2006
BE12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/10]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
DK12.07.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
PT12.09.2006
Former [2007/03]AT12.04.2006
CH12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
LI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/52]AT12.04.2006
FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/51]FI12.04.2006
SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/50]SE12.07.2006
ES23.07.2006
Former [2006/48]SE12.07.2006
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP1026912  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 8, paragraph 37 - paragraph 44; figures 2,3 * [A] 3-8;
 [A]DE1130482  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SHIH-CHIAN YANG ET AL, "RECONFIGURABLE FAULT TOLERANT NETWORKS FOR FAST PACKET SWITCHING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON RELIABILITY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19911001), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9529, pages 474 - 487, XP000232098 [A] 1-8 * figure 14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/24.93770