Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317213

EP1317213 - MULTI-FASTENER SURGICAL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.10.2006  [2006/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Vascular Technologies LLC
23 Prince Street
Newton, MA 02465 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Arnold
27 Intervale Road
Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel
Patentanwälte
Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date01972933.431.08.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US27166
Priority number, dateUS20000229674P01.09.2000         Original published format: US 229674 P
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0217771
Date:07.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317213
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHES VIELFACHFIXIERUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2003/24]
English:MULTI-FASTENER SURGICAL APPARATUS AND METHOD[2003/24]
French:PINCE CHIRURGICALE MULTIPLE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2003/48]
Former [2003/24]PINCE CHIRURGICALE MULTIPLE ET PROC D ASSOCI
Entry into regional phase01.04.2003National basic fee paid 
01.04.2003Search fee paid 
01.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
01.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/41]
18.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6132438  (FLEISCHMAN SIDNEY D [US], et al);
 [A]US5540701  (SHARKEY HUGH R [US], et al);
 [A]US5997556  (TANNER HOWARD [US])