Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319002

EP1319002 - ALPHA V INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARISON, Byron, H.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
02 / CUI, Donghui
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
03 / DUGGAN, Mark, E.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
04 / FANG, Xiaojun
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
05 / HALCZENKO, Wasyl
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
06 / HUTCHINSON, John, H.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
07 / PRUEKSARITANONT, Thomayant
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
08 / SUBRAMANIAN, Raju
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Terlings Park
Eastwick Road, Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/27]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2003/25]Hiscock, Ian James
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date01972971.410.09.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001US28238
Priority number, dateUS20000232344P14.09.2000         Original published format: US 232344 P
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222615
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319002
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P19/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesAL14.04.2003
LT14.04.2003
LV14.04.2003
MK14.04.2003
RO14.04.2003
SI14.04.2003
TitleGerman:ALPHA V INTEGRIN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN[2003/25]
English:ALPHA V INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[2003/25]
French:ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE L'ALPHA V INTEGRINE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2003National basic fee paid 
14.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
19.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
04.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[DX]US6017926  (ASKEW BEN C [US], et al) [DX] 1,11 * compound 7-9;; claims 1,22 *;
 [PX]WO0153297  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,11 * compound 9-7;; claims 1,8 *